Cityzenith Holdings, Inc. et al v. Liddell et al
Plaintiff: Cityzenith Holdings, Inc. and Michael Jansen
Defendant: Shane Liddell and Caleb Naysmith
Case Number: 1:2022cv05101
Filed: September 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Telephonic motion hearing held. Plaintiffs' counsel's motion to withdraw as attorneys of record #13 is granted. The appearances of Peter S. Lubin, Patrick D. Austermuehle, and Terrence Buehler of the Law Offices of Terrence Buehler are withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Cityzenith Holdings, Inc. and Michael Jansen. Plaintiffs have until 1/6/2023 to retain counsel and to have an appearance filed. Telephone conference set for 1/18/2023 at 9:30 a.m. and with joint status report due by 1/11/2023. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email with instructions to join the call. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the recordbefore speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 11/15/2022. Mailed notice. (cxr, )
October 18, 2022 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Minute entry #12 is corrected - Caleb Naysmith terminated. Mailed notice (rj, )
October 17, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by PETER S. LUBIN for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney, #13 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 11/9/2022 at 09:45 AM. (LUBIN, PETER)
October 17, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION by Attorney Peter Lubin, Patrick Austermuehle, Terrence Buehler to withdraw as attorney for Cityzenith Holdings, Inc., Michael Jansen. New address information: Cityzenith Holdings, Inc. and Michael Jansen, 2506 N. Clark Street, Suite 235, Chicago, IL 60614 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LUBIN, PETER)
October 13, 2022 Filing 16 Case reopened. Mailed notice (rj, )
October 13, 2022 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants the parties' motion to dismiss claims against Defendant Naysmith with prejudice #9 . The Court dismisses this matter against Defendant Naysmith with prejudice and with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Mailed notice (rj, ) Modified on 10/18/2022 (rj, ).
October 6, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Cityzenith Holdings, Inc., Michael Jansen. Shane Liddell waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 1/4/2023. (LUBIN, PETER)
September 27, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by PETER S. LUBIN for presentment of motion to dismiss #9 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 10/13/2022 at 01:45 PM. (LUBIN, PETER)
September 27, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiffs Cityzenith Holdings, Inc., Michael Jansen to dismiss Claims Aganist Caleb Naysmith With Prejudice (LUBIN, PETER)
September 22, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Shane Liddell (ak, )
September 21, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED complaint by Cityzenith Holdings, Inc., Michael Jansen against All Defendants (LUBIN, PETER)
September 21, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 11/22/2022 at 9:30 AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' website and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 11/15/2022. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll-free number). Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
September 20, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ey, )
September 20, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ey, )
September 19, 2022 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Cityzenith Holdings, Inc. (Austermuehle, Patrick)
September 19, 2022 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cityzenith Holdings, Inc., Michael Jansen by Patrick Doyle Austermuehle (Austermuehle, Patrick)
September 19, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cityzenith Holdings, Inc., Michael Jansen by Terrence Buehler (Buehler, Terrence)
September 19, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cityzenith Holdings, Inc., Michael Jansen by PETER S. LUBIN (LUBIN, PETER)
September 19, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (LUBIN, PETER)
September 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Cityzenith Holdings, Inc., Michael Jansen; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19856783.(LUBIN, PETER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cityzenith Holdings, Inc. et al v. Liddell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cityzenith Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Doyle Austermuehle
Represented By: PETER S. LUBIN
Represented By: Terrence Buehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jansen
Represented By: Patrick Doyle Austermuehle
Represented By: Terrence Buehler
Represented By: PETER S. LUBIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Liddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caleb Naysmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?