OnMyWhey, LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Plaintiff: OnMyWhey, LLC
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Case Number: 1:2022cv06072
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2022 Filing 37 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 15, 2022 Filing 36 PRELIMINARY Injunction Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/15/2022. Mailed notice(lk, )
December 15, 2022 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Status hearing held on 12/15/2022. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #30 is granted. Order to follow. Status hearing set for 2/9/2023 at 9:15 AM which will proceed in Courtroom 2503. Virtual hearings will be held on Fridays at 9:30 AM but must be pre-approved by the Court. If you need to appear virtually, send the attached form to Judge Kendall's courtroom deputy. The courtroom deputy will inform you as to whether your request has been approved. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Virtual Hearing Request Form) (lk, )
December 14, 2022 Filing 34 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff OnMyWhey, LLC by Quinn Bradley Guillermo (Guillermo, Quinn)
December 12, 2022 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OnMyWhey, LLC as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A on 12/12/2022, answer due 1/2/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin T. Joseph, #2 Exhibit A)(Joseph, Justin)
December 12, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Motion by Justin Tyler Joseph for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #30 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/15/2022 at 09:15 AM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Joseph, Justin)
December 12, 2022 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM by OnMyWhey, LLC in support of motion for preliminary injunction #30 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin T. Joseph, #2 Exhibit 1)(Joseph, Justin)
December 12, 2022 Filing 30 MOTION by Plaintiff OnMyWhey, LLC for preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Joseph, Justin)
December 12, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A (dxb, )
November 29, 2022 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Plaintiff's Motion to extend the Temporary Restraining Order #26 is granted. Temporary Restraining Order shall remain in effect up to and including 12/15/2022. Status hearing set for 12/15/2022 at 9:15 AM which will proceed in person in Courtroom 2503. Mailed notice (lk, )
November 28, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Motion by Justin Tyler Joseph for presentment of extension of time #26 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/1/2022 at 09:15 AM. (Joseph, Justin)
November 28, 2022 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM by OnMyWhey, LLC in support of extension of time #26 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin T. Joseph)(Joseph, Justin)
November 28, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION by Plaintiff OnMyWhey, LLC for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Joseph, Justin)
November 22, 2022 Filing 25 SURETY BOND in the amount of $10,000.00 posted by OnMyWhey, LLC (Document not scanned). (lxk, )
November 17, 2022 Filing 24 Temporary Restraining Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 11/17/2022. Mailed notice(lk, ) Modified on 12/19/2022 (exr, ).
November 17, 2022 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Motion hearing held on 11/17/2022 via Webex. Plaintiff's Sealed Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #13 is granted and shall remain in effect up to and including 12/1/2022. Plaintiff's Motion for electronic service of process #18 is granted. Sealed Order to follow. Status hearing set for 12/1/2022 at 9:15 AM. Prior to the hearing, you are directed to cut and paste this hyper link into a browser: https://us-courts.webex.com/join/virginia_kendallilnd.uscourts.gov If you do not have access to a device with video capability, please use the dial in option: (650)-479-3207, the access code is: 180 698 4009. If you do have access to a device with video capability, you are directed to appear telephonically. Mailed notice (lk, )
November 15, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jb, )
November 10, 2022 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Motion hearing set for 11/17/2022 at 9:00 AM will proceed via Webex. Prior to the hearing, you are directed to cut and paste this hyper link into a browser: https://us-courts.webex.com/join/virginia_kendallilnd.uscourts.gov If you do not have access to a device with video capability, please use the dial in option: (650)-479-3207, the access code is: 180 698 4009. If you do have access to a device with video capability, you are directed to appear telephonically.Mailed notice (lk, )
November 9, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order #13 , motion for miscellaneous relief #18 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 11/17/2022 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
November 9, 2022 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #19 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 9, 2022 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM by OnMyWhey, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #18 (Gaudio, Justin)
November 9, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION by Plaintiff OnMyWhey, LLC for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Gaudio, Justin)
November 9, 2022 Filing 17 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff OnMyWhey, LLC Exhibit 2 regarding declaration #16 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 12/19/2022 (exr, ).
November 9, 2022 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Kayvon Pourmirzaie regarding memorandum in support of motion #14 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 9, 2022 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #14 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 9, 2022 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by OnMyWhey, LLC in support of motion for temporary restraining order #13 (Gaudio, Justin)
November 9, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff OnMyWhey, LLC for temporary restraining order Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin)
November 9, 2022 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file under seal #4 is granted. Mailed notice (lk, )
November 4, 2022 Filing 11 MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (cxr, )
November 3, 2022 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff OnMyWhey, LLC by Justin Tyler Joseph (Joseph, Justin)
November 3, 2022 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff OnMyWhey, LLC by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
November 3, 2022 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff OnMyWhey, LLC by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
November 3, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of Claims Involving Patents by OnMyWhey, LLC (Gaudio, Justin)
November 3, 2022 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by OnMyWhey, LLC (Gaudio, Justin)
November 3, 2022 Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin)
November 3, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff OnMyWhey, LLC for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin)
November 3, 2022 Filing 3 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff OnMyWhey, LLC Exhibit 1 regarding complaint #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 12/19/2022 (exr, ).
November 3, 2022 Filing 2 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff OnMyWhey, LLC Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 12/19/2022 (exr, ).
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by OnMyWhey, LLC ; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20009552. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 3, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OnMyWhey, LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OnMyWhey, LLC
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Justin Tyler Joseph
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Quinn Bradley Guillermo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?