Hengste SE v. Luber-Finer, Inc.
Plaintiff: HENGST SE
Defendant: LUBER-FINER, INC.
Case Number: 1:2022cv06134
Filed: November 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2022 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Hengst SE by Justin Tyler Joseph (Joseph, Justin)
December 29, 2022 Filing 9 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, )
November 30, 2022 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephone Conference set for 2/8/23 at 9:30 a.m. Joint status report shall be filed by 2/1/23. Dial: 888-684-8852 or 215-446-0155, access code: 9582710#. Mailed notice (maf)
November 18, 2022 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Hengst SE by Benjamin C.R. Lockyer (Lockyer, Benjamin)
November 18, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Luber-Finer, Inc. (jk2, )
November 7, 2022 Filing 6 MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (cxr, )
November 4, 2022 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff HENGST SE by Patrick James Smith (Smith, Patrick)
November 4, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Claims Involving Patents by HENGST SE (Smith, Patrick)
November 4, 2022 Filing 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by HENGST SE (Smith, Patrick)
November 4, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Smith, Patrick)
November 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by HENGST SE; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20016796. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Smith, Patrick)
November 4, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (smb, )
November 4, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (smb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hengste SE v. Luber-Finer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENGST SE
Represented By: Patrick James Smith
Represented By: Benjamin C.R. Lockyer
Represented By: Justin Tyler Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUBER-FINER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?