Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP Address 75.15.251.213
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP Address 75.15.251.213
Case Number: 1:2022cv06232
Filed: November 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Referring Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2022 Filing 11 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE. The Honorable Gary S. Feinerman will resign his Commission as a United States District Judge effective December 31, 2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED That the civil cases on the attached list are to be reassigned to the other judges of this Court as indicated, pursuant to Local Rule 40.1(f). IT IS ALSO ORDERED That any civil case that was assigned to the Honorable Gary S. Feinerman and may require further judicial action in the future, shall be reassigned by lot to a judge of this Court. Case reassigned to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood for all further proceedings. Honorable Gary Feinerman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 12/28/2022. (rp, )
November 28, 2022 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for discovery #7 is granted. Plaintiff may serve a subpoena on non-party AT&T U-verse to obtain the name and address of Defendant Doe. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 21, 2022 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC in support of motion for discovery #7 Memorandum ISO Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Walsh, Patrick)
November 21, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC for discovery Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Walsh, Patrick)
November 16, 2022 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 1/23/2023 at 9:00 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 1/17/2023. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov) for details on the Initial Status Hearing and Initial Status Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 10, 2022 Filing 5 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (cxr, )
November 9, 2022 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Walsh, Patrick)
November 9, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Walsh, Patrick)
November 9, 2022 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC by Patrick Joseph Walsh (Walsh, Patrick)
November 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC ; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20029695. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Walsh, Patrick)
November 9, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lm, )
November 9, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP Address 75.15.251.213
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP Address 75.15.251.213
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?