Garner v. Kibb et al
Plaintiff: James Garner
Defendant: Steven Kibb and Thomas Costello
Case Number: 1:2022cv06299
Filed: November 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2022 Filing 9 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: After screening pro se plaintiff's complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2), the Court dismisses this lawsuit under the duplicative litigation doctrine. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 12/30/2022. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 29, 2022 Filing 7 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, )
November 16, 2022 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiff's emergency motion for temporary restraining order #5 is stricken for failure to request an emergency hearing in accordance with this court's standing orders and failure to pay the filing fee or file an IFP petition as required by Local Rule 3.3. Plaintiff has until 12/16 to either pay the filing fee or submit a completed In Forma Pauperis Application and Financial Affidavit. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action. Mailed notice. (ym, )
November 9, 2022 Filing 5 EMERGENCY MOTION by Plaintiff James Garner for temporary restraining order (TRO), Preliminary injunction and for plaintiff to present evidence including testimony from Thomas Costello and Philip Cocomise at any TRO hearing. (rc, )
November 9, 2022 Filing 4 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff James Garner. (rc, )
November 9, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (rc, )
November 9, 2022 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and by James Garner. (Exhibits) (rc, )
November 9, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
November 9, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garner v. Kibb et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Kibb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?