Cohan v. Wayne Hummer Trust, Co.
Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Defendant: Wayne Hummer Trust, Co. and Himalaya Enterprises-Gurnee, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv06345
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2023 Filing 11 AMENDED complaint by Howard Cohan against Himalaya Enterprises-Gurnee, LLC and terminating Wayne Hummer Trust, Co. (a Delaware corporation ) (Spears, Angela)
January 5, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Himalaya Enterprises-Gurnee, LLC (smb, )
January 4, 2023 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's second motion for leave to file an amended complaint #9 is granted. Plaintiff is directed to put the proper judge's name on his documents and file the Second Amended Complaint as a separate docket entry. Mailed notice (cn).
January 4, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Howard Cohan for leave to file (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Spears, Angela)
December 30, 2022 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED complaint by Howard Cohan against Wayne Hummer Trust, Co. (Spears, Angela)
December 30, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file First Amended Complaint #5 is granted. Plaintiff is directed to file the amended complaint as a separate docket entry. Mailed notice (cn).
December 29, 2022 Filing 6 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 29, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Howard Cohan for leave to file (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Spears, Angela)
November 14, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Spears, Angela)
November 14, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Howard Cohan by Angela C. Spears (Spears, Angela)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: #Local Rule 3.1# requires at the time of filing a case, plaintiff's counsel, or if the case is filed pro se, the plaintiff shall file with the original papers a completed designation sheet (civil cover sheet). No civil cover sheet was submitted at the time of filing this matter. Howard Cohan is directed to file the #Civil Cover Sheet# within 14 days of this notification. Signed by the Executive Committee. (jk2, )
November 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Howard Cohan; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20042674.(Spears, Angela)
November 14, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jk2, )
November 14, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Wayne Hummer Trust, Co. (smb, )
November 14, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jk2, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohan v. Wayne Hummer Trust, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Represented By: Angela C. Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Hummer Trust, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Himalaya Enterprises-Gurnee, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?