Universal Entertainment Corporation v. Aruze Gaming America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Universal Entertainment Corporation
Defendant: Aruze Gaming America, Inc. and Kazuo Okada
Respondent: Chris Lind
Counter Defendant: Aruze USA and Jun Fujimoto
Case Number: 1:2022cv06938
Filed: December 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2022 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/14/2022, Telephonic Hearing before the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Order Number: 44794, 44795. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen_Conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov or 312.435.5594. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 1/4/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/16/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/14/2023. (Conway, Colleen)
December 14, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Telephone hearing on the motion to quash subpoena #1 . For the reasons stated on the record, the motion #1 is granted, without prejudice to a new subpoena being issued after the parties confer. Notices mailed. (psm, )
December 13, 2022 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Telephone hearing on the motion to quash is reset to 12/14/2022 at 9:45 a.m. The Court will make itself available for an in-person hearing on 12/14/22, if requested. Parties to the case, members of the public, and the media, may participate in/listen to these proceedings by dialing 1-888-204-5984 and using access code 9146677. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notices mailed. (psm, )
December 12, 2022 Filing 5 RE #1 Motion to Quash Subpoena - NOTICE of Motion by Sean M. Berkowitz for presentment of before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 12/15/2022 at 09:45 AM. (Berkowitz, Sean)
December 12, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (smb, )
December 12, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (smb, )
December 9, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Chris Lind by Joshua Phares Ackerman (Ackerman, Joshua)
December 9, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Chris Lind by Sean M. Berkowitz (Berkowitz, Sean)
December 9, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Berkowitz, Sean)
December 9, 2022 Filing 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE by Chris Lind Motion to Quash Subpoena Filing fee $ 49, receipt number AILNDC-20127530. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chris Lind)(Berkowitz, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal Entertainment Corporation v. Aruze Gaming America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Entertainment Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aruze Gaming America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kazuo Okada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chris Lind
Represented By: Sean M. Berkowitz
Represented By: Joshua Phares Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Aruze USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jun Fujimoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?