Schoeps et al v. Sompo Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Julius H. Schoeps, Britt-Marie Enhoerning and Florence Von Kesselstatt
Defendant: Sompo Holdings, Inc., Sompo International Holdings Ltd., Sompo Fine Art Foundation and Sompo Museum of Art
Case Number: 1:2022cv07013
Filed: December 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Replevin & Conversion
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Sompo Fine Art Foundation, Sompo Holdings, Inc., Sompo International Holdings Ltd., Sompo Museum of Art (smb, )
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: By 2/14/23, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lm, )
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lm, )
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Britt-Marie Enhoerning, Julius H. Schoeps, Florence Von Kesselstatt by Matthew Allen Alvis (Alvis, Matthew)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Britt-Marie Enhoerning, Julius H. Schoeps, Florence Von Kesselstatt by Desiree F. Moore (Moore, Desiree)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Britt-Marie Enhoerning, Julius H. Schoeps, Florence Von Kesselstatt by John William Rotunno (Rotunno, John)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rotunno, John)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Restitution and Unjust Enrichment filed by Julius H. Schoeps, Florence Von Kesselstatt, Britt-Marie Enhoerning; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20137719. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Rotunno, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schoeps et al v. Sompo Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julius H. Schoeps
Represented By: Desiree F. Moore
Represented By: John William Rotunno
Represented By: Matthew Allen Alvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Britt-Marie Enhoerning
Represented By: Matthew Allen Alvis
Represented By: Desiree F. Moore
Represented By: John William Rotunno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florence Von Kesselstatt
Represented By: Desiree F. Moore
Represented By: Matthew Allen Alvis
Represented By: John William Rotunno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sompo Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sompo International Holdings Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sompo Fine Art Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sompo Museum of Art
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?