Gibbs v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Loretta Gibbs
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2022cv07213
Filed: December 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Referring Judge: Susan E Cox
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2023 Filing 14 CERTIFIED COPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raedy, Valerie)
February 9, 2023 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint by 2/20/2023 and deliver a courtesy copy to Room 1024. Pursuant to Local Rule 8.1(b), the Social Security Administration's filing of the certified administrative record, in and of itself, shall suffice as the agency's answer to the complaint. Plaintiff's opening brief is due on or before 3/22/2023. Defendant's response brief is due on or before 4/21/2023. Plaintiff's reply, if any, is due on or before 5/5/2023. (rbf, )
February 1, 2023 Filing 12 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Susan E. Cox for all further proceedings. Honorable Edmond E. Chang no longer assigned to the case pursuant to Local Rule 73.1. Signed by Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 02/01/2023. (daj, )
February 1, 2023 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of the joint consent to the magistrate judge's jurisdiction, the status hearing of 02/24/2023 is vacated. The consent will be processed with the Executive Committee. Emailed notice (mw, )
January 17, 2023 Filing 10 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Olinsky, Howard)
January 10, 2023 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of financial indigency, the Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. Initial tracking status hearing set for 02/24/2023 at 8:30 a.m. to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). The parties must file a joint initial status report by 02/16/2023 reporting on the status of the administrative record. The Court encourages the parties to consent to the magistrate judge's jurisdiction, but that is their choice and withholding consent will result in no adverse substantive consequences. Emailed notice (mw, )
January 5, 2023 Filing 8 DESIGNATION of Valerie Rebecca Raedy as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Raedy, Valerie)
December 29, 2022 Filing 7 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 22, 2022 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Loretta Gibbs by Neil H. Good (Good, Neil)
December 22, 2022 Filing 5 The parties are required to provide notice of any prior case filed by Plaintiff that resulted in a remand for further administrative proceedings. If there was a prior remanded case that is not identified on the Civil Cover Sheet in this action, the parties are ordered to file a Notification of the prior case within 30 days. That Notification is to provide the case name, number and assigned judge. (smb, )
December 22, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Loretta Gibbs by Howard D. Olinsky (Olinsky, Howard)
December 22, 2022 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Loretta Gibbs for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Olinsky, Howard)
December 22, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Olinsky, Howard)
December 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Loretta Gibbs; (Olinsky, Howard)
December 22, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (smb, )
December 22, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (smb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibbs v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Gibbs
Represented By: Neil H. Good
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Valerie Rebecca Raedy
Represented By: AUSA - SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?