Bower et al v. Steel River Systems, LLC
Plaintiff: Amber Bower and Joel Courtney
Defendant: Steel River Systems, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00136
Filed: January 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John F Kness
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2023 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Plaintiffs have filed a "Notice of Voluntary Dismissal" #10 . Because the notice of dismissal was filed before the opposing party served either an answer or a motion for summary judgment, the case is dismissed without prejudice consistent with the terms of the Notice and by operation of Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See Nelson v. Napolitano, 657 F.3d 586, 587 (7th Cir. 2011) (Rule 41(a)(1)(A) notice of dismissal "is self-executing and effective without further action from the court"). Each party is to bear its own fees and costs. The hearing set for 3/23/2023 is stricken, and all pending motions are dismissed as moot. Civil case terminated. Emailed notice. (cdh, )
March 13, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Amber Bower, Joel Courtney (Bolce, Cody)
March 10, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION by Attorney Samuel J. Strauss to withdraw as attorney for Amber Bower, Joel Courtney. No party information provided (Strauss, Samuel)
March 6, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joel Courtney, Amber Bower as to Steel River Systems, LLC on 2/28/2023, answer due 3/21/2023. (Bell, Theodore)
March 6, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20410789. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bell, Theodore)
March 6, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20410744. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bell, Theodore)
March 6, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Amber Bower, Joel Courtney by Theodore Beloyeannis Bell (Bell, Theodore)
February 21, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Steel River Systems, LLC (kra, )
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 1/26/2023: Telephonic initial status hearing is set for 3/23/2023 at 9:30 AM. Consistent with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference in advance of the initial status hearing. No later than ten days before the status hearing, the parties shall jointly complete and file on the docket a report that provides the information required by the Court's model Joint Initial Status Report, which can be found at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?Iu9/vqz23r5X7AkWx/nLtg== (see link entitled "Joint Initial Status Report"). If all Defendants have not yet been served or have not yet responded to requests to draft the required Joint Initial Status Report, Plaintiff must file the report on its own and must inform the Court of that circumstance. The parties are to use the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, conference code 3796759. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Mailed notice (ef, )
January 11, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Amber Bower, Joel Courtney by Samuel J. Strauss (Strauss, Samuel)
January 10, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Strauss, Samuel)
January 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Class Action filed by Joel Courtney, Amber Bower; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20222064.(Strauss, Samuel)
January 10, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (sxh, )
January 10, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bower et al v. Steel River Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Bower
Represented By: Samuel J. Strauss
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Courtney
Represented By: Samuel J. Strauss
Represented By: Theodore Beloyeannis Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steel River Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?