State National Insurance Company, Inc. v. Rodriguez et al
Plaintiff: State National Insurance Company, Inc.
Defendant: Roberto Linares Rodriguez, Kevin Collier, DS1 Logistics and daniel Stojanovic
Case Number: 1:2023cv00143
Filed: January 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2023 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Telephonic status hearing held. Oral motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead by 3/28/2023 is granted. Telephonic status hearing set for 4/16/2023 at 10:20 a.m. For the telephonic status hearing, parties are to use the following call-in number: (888) 684 8852, conference code 8819984. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. COUNSEL MUST TYPE IN THEIR NAME WHEN JOINING THE CALL. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Mailed notice (vcf, )
February 24, 2023 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Telephonic status hearing set for 3/7/2023 at 10:20 a.m. For the telephonic status hearing, parties are to use the following call-in number: (888) 684 8852, conference code 8819984. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. COUNSEL MUST TYPE IN THEIR NAME WHEN JOINING THE CALL. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Thank you for your cooperation. Mailed notice (vcf, )
February 8, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Roberto Linares Rodriguez(O'Shea, Christopher)
January 26, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State National Insurance Company, Inc. as to Kevin Collier on 1/25/2023, answer due 2/15/2023. (Korn, Joseph)
January 19, 2023 Filing 9 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff State National Insurance Company, Inc. regarding complaint #1 (Korn, Joseph)
January 19, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State National Insurance Company, Inc. as to daniel Stojanovic on 1/17/2023, answer due 2/7/2023. (Korn, Joseph)
January 19, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State National Insurance Company, Inc. as to Roberto Linares Rodriguez on 1/17/2023, answer due 2/7/2023. (Korn, Joseph)
January 19, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State National Insurance Company, Inc. as to DS1 Logistics on 1/17/2023, answer due 2/7/2023. (Korn, Joseph)
January 17, 2023 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendants Kevin Collier, Roberto Linares Rodriguez. (sxh, )
January 12, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Kevin Collier, DS1 Logistics, Roberto Linares Rodriguez, daniel Stojanovic (jb, )
January 11, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff State National Insurance Company, Inc. by Joseph Arthur Korn (Korn, Joseph)
January 11, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff State National Insurance Company, Inc. by Thomas Everett Soule (Soule, Thomas)
January 11, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff State National Insurance Company, Inc. by John William Patton, Jr (Patton, John)
January 11, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Patton, John)
January 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by State National Insurance Company, Inc.; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20225644.(Patton, John)
January 11, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lm, )
January 11, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State National Insurance Company, Inc. v. Rodriguez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State National Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Arthur Korn
Represented By: Thomas Everett Soule
Represented By: John William Patton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Linares Rodriguez
Represented By: Christopher Morgan O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DS1 Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: daniel Stojanovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?