Zeikos Inc. v. Walgreen Co.
Plaintiff: Zeikos Inc.
Defendant: Walgreen Co. and nefmednwk
Case Number: 1:2023cv00303
Filed: January 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MAILED Rule 83.15 Letter to all counsel of record. (ph, )
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 RECEIVED from New Jersey; Case Number 2:21-cv-19993. (ph, )
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting in part #29 Defendant's Motion to the extent that the Clerk of the Court shall TRANSFER this matter to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois - Eastern Division. The remainder of Defendant's Motion is DEFERRED to the transferee court. The Clerk shall CLOSE the matter in this Court. Signed by Judge Evelyn Padin on 1/18/2023. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 OPINION. Signed by Judge Evelyn Padin on 1/18/2023. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #67 Order. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Letter from Michael M. Yi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(YI, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Joint Letter regarding Request for a Stay of Discovery submitted by Michael M. Yi, Counsel for Defendant. (Filing Received via the ECF Help Desk E-mail) (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte: The Court held a status conference on December 20, 2022. At the conference, Defendant reiterated its request to stay discovery pending disposition of its motion to transfer venue. The Court granted the parties leave to brief the issue and directed the parties to file a joint letter on the stay request by January 6, 2023. A status conference was scheduled for February 2, 2023. (Court Reporter, ECR) (akw, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 TEXT ORDER: No later than January 6, 2023, the parties shall submit a joint letter outlining their respective positions on Defendants request for a stay of discovery pending adjudication of the motion to transfer (ECF No. 29). The parties shall also indicate whether a follow-up mediation session with Judge Friedman has been scheduled, as referenced in the parties December 1, 2022 status letter (ECF No. 61). Further, by January 13, 2023, Defendant shall provide to Plaintiff a schedule of the depositions that shall take place by March 2023. A status conference is scheduled for February 2, 2023, at 3:00 p.m. Prior to the conference, but no later than January 26, 2023, the parties shall file a joint letter not to exceed five (5) pages summarizing the status of the case and any other issue that the Court needs to consider during the telephonic status conference. The dial-in information for the conference is (888) 684-8852, access code 1364268. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 01/03/2023. (akw) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STATUS REPORT Pursuant to the Courts First Amended Scheduling Order, dated October 17, 2022 (Dkt. 54) by ZEIKOS INC.. (SCILEPPI, LAURA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' joint dispute letter dated November 7, 2022 (ECF No. 57). Plaintiff's request that the Court compel Defendant to schedule depositions now, in order to meet the February 16, 2023 fact discovery deadline, is DENIED. The parties shall be guided by the Court's First Amended Scheduling Order (ECF No. 54), and shall work diligently to meet the fact discovery deadline of February 16, 2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 11/22/2022. (smf) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 TEXT ORDER: The status conference scheduled for December 13, 2022 has been rescheduled to December 20, 2022, at 3:30 p.m. Please dial 888-684-8852, access code 1364268. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 11/16/2022. (smf) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by ZEIKOS INC. re #55 MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laura Scileppi, #2 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Laura Scileppi)(SCILEPPI, LAURA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Letter from Laura Scileppi. (SCILEPPI, LAURA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by WALGREEN CO. re #55 MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service 11-2-2022)(YI, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #55 MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Admission. Motion set for 11/21/2022 before Judge Evelyn Padin. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Admission by ZEIKOS INC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Compel, #2 Declaration of Laura Scileppi in Support of Motion to Compel, #3 Exhibit A to the Scileppi Decl, #4 Exhibit B to the Scileppi Decl, #5 Exhibit C to the Scileppi Decl, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service) (SCILEPPI, LAURA) Modified on 10/24/2022 (dam). [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee received as to D. Jane Cooper: $ 150, receipt number TRE129188 (in-cmk, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER referring this matter to Private Mediation; extending Fact Discovery deadline through 2/16/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 10/14/2022. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Letter from Michael M. Yi, Esq. 10-14-22. (YI, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER regarding #49 Joint Dispute Letter. Defendant shall produce documents in response to the document requests identified in Paragraphs 1(a) - 1(j) of this Order. Plaintiff's requests that this Court compel Defendant to produce documents in response to document requests 8-10, 12-17, 19-30, 37, and 38 are DENIED. All documents produce in response to this Order shall be produced no later than 12/15/2022, including any documents agreed to be produced as early as 5/5/2022. No later than 10/13/2022, the parties shall file a letter informing the Court of which mediator they have selected. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 10/11/2022. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to D. JANE COOPER, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 10/11/2022. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte: Discovery Dispute Hearing held on 10/7/2022. (Court Reporter, ECR) (smf) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WALGREEN CO.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of D. Jane Cooper, Esq. 10-6-22, #2 Text of Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Counsel)(YI, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Letter from Laura Scileppi re 48 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(SCILEPPI, LAURA) Modified on 10/3/2022 (dam). Modified on 10/11/2022 (smf). [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying #31 Defendant's Request to Stay Discovery. The parties shall make good faith efforts to resolve their disputes raised in Plaintiff's Letters at ECF #33 and #43 . No later than 9/30/2022, the parties shall submit one joint letter narrowing the discovery disputes before the Court. An in-person Status Conference is scheduled for 10/7/2022 at 11:00 AM - Newark - Courtroom 9. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 9/22/2022. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Scheduling Order Deadlines re #47 Order: In Person Status Conference set for 10/7/2022 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TEXT ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record on September 21, 2022, Defendant's motion to stay discovery (ECF No. 31) is DENIED. The parties shall meet and confer regarding the discovery disputes raised in Plaintiff's letters at ECF Nos. 33 and 43. No later than September 30, 2022, the parties shall submit ONE JOINT LETTER narrowing the discovery disputes before the Court. For each discovery dispute that the parties are not able to compromise on, the joint letter shall (1) describe the discovery request in dispute, (2) explain the requesting partys position, and (3) explain the opposing partys position. If there is more than one discovery dispute, the parties shall follow the format set forth in the preceding sentence for each issue or group of issues. An in-person status conference is scheduled for October 7, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. to discuss any discovery disputes that may remain after the parties' meet and confer efforts. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 9/21/2022. (smf) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte: Discovery Dispute Hearing held on 9/21/2022. At the conference, the Court addressed Defendant's motion to stay at ECF No. 31 and denied Defendant's motion. An appropriate Order was entered. The Court scheduled a status conference for October 7, 2022, to discuss any remaining discovery disputes. (smf) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Letter from Laura Scileppi re #45 Letter. (SCILEPPI, LAURA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Letter from Michael M. Yi, Esq. 9-21-22. (YI, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Letter from Laura Scileppi re #33 Letter, #43 Letter. (SCILEPPI, LAURA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Letter from Laura Scileppi re #21 Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(SCILEPPI, LAURA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TEXT ORDER: For all motions in this matter currently pending before Judge Padin, the parties shall, by 8/5/22, and to the extent they have not already, send one courtesy copy of their motion papers, including exhibits, to Judge Padins chambers. So Ordered by Judge Evelyn Padin on 7/28/2022. (akw, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Letter from Laura Scileppi re 37 Order,. (SCILEPPI, LAURA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Letter from Michael M. Yi, Esq.. (YI, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by WALGREEN CO. re #31 MOTION to Stay Discovery (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael M. Yi 7-11-22, #2 Exhibit A to Yi Reply Declaration, #3 Certificate of Service 7-11-22)(YI, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by WALGREEN CO. re #29 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Illinois (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service 7-11-22)(YI, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ORDER: This matter was recently reassigned to Judge Padin. Within 14 days, the parties shall confer and file a concise joint letter: (1) providing a brief summary of the claims and defenses; and (2) advising the Court of the status of discovery, any pending motions, settlement discussions (including whether the parties are interested in a settlement conference), and any other issues to be addressed. So Ordered by Judge Evelyn Padin on 7/8/2022. (akw, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by ZEIKOS INC. re #31 MOTION to Stay (SCILEPPI, LAURA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by ZEIKOS INC. re #29 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Illinois (SCILEPPI, LAURA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Letter from Laura Scileppi re 32 Text Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(SCILEPPI, LAURA) Modified on 6/29/2022 (dam). [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Evelyn Padin for all further proceedings. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/27/2022. (mxw, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Evelyn Padin. Judge Susan D. Wigenton no longer assigned to the case. (mxw, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #29 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Illinois, and #31 MOTION to Stay Discovery. Motions set for 7/18/2022 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, these motions will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ORDER: : First, Defendant's Motions at ECF Nos. 29 and 31, although filed without leave and thus in violation of the Pretrial Scheduling Order at ECF No. 21, will be considered by the Court. Second, it is apparent to the Court from the parties' most recent joint submission (ECF No. 30) that the parties are failing to meet and confer in good faith as required by Local Civil Rule 37.1. The parties shall make good faith efforts to resolve their disputes before seeking Court intervention. Accordingly, the parties are ordered to meet and confer, via Zoom, no later than June 24, 2022, to meaningfully discuss their discovery or case management disputes. No later than June 28, 2022, the parties shall submit one JOINT letter informing the Court whether the parties resolved their discovery disputes. Failure by any party to meet and confer in good faith or to participate in writing a joint letter will result in the Court deeming that party to have waived its right to take any position on the discovery issue(s) in dispute. A status conference is scheduled for September 21, 2022, at 2:30 p.m. No later than September 14, 2022, the parties shall file a joint letter not to exceed five (5) pages summarizing the status of the case. The dial-in information for the conference is (888) 684-8852, access code 1364268. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 6/22/2022. (smf) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte: Status Conference held on 6/22/2022. No later than June 24, 2022, the parties were ordered to meet and confer, via Zoom, to discuss the issues raised in the letter filed at ECF No. 30. The parties then may follow the protocol outlined in the Courts Pretrial Scheduling Order for raising discovery disputes. A status conference was scheduled for September 21, 2022. (smf) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Stay by WALGREEN CO.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Stay 6-21-22, #2 Declaration of Darin V. Osmond 6-21-22, #3 Exhibit A to Osmond's Declaration, #4 Declaration of Michael M. Yi 6-21-22, #5 Exhibit A to Yi's Declaration, #6 Exhibit B to Yi's Declaration, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service 6-21-22)(YI, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Letter from Laura Scileppi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SCILEPPI, LAURA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Illinois by WALGREEN CO.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue 6-21-22, #2 Declaration of Darin V. Osmond 6-21-22, #3 Exhibit A to Osmond's Declaration, #4 Declaration of Michael M. Yi 6-21-22, #5 Exhibit A to Yi's Declaration, #6 Exhibit B to Yi's Declaration, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service 6-21-22)(YI, MICHAEL) Modified on 6/23/2022 (dam). [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Letter from Laura Scileppi re #21 Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(SCILEPPI, LAURA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's letter dated June 2, 2022, noting Defendant's refusal to meet and confer on a number of discovery disputes [ECF No. 25], and Defendant's response to same [ECF No. 26]. Defendant's request for a stay of discovery pending resolution of an anticipated motion to dismiss is DENIED, without prejudice, with leave to move again when appropriate. In the interim, the parties shall proceed with discovery in the ordinary course. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 6/7/2022. (smf) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Letter from Michael M. Yi, Esq.. (YI, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Letter from Laura Scileppi. (SCILEPPI, LAURA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against WALGREEN CO., filed by ZEIKOS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(SCILEPPI, LAURA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER that Plaintiff may file the Amended Complaint annexed hereto as Exhibit A (the Amended Complaint). Defendant shall respond to the Amended Complaint within 30 days from the date of the filing of the Amended Complaint. etc re #22 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 5/23/2022. (bt) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Proposed Order and Stipulation to File Amended Complaint by ZEIKOS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to the Proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to the Proposed Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C to the Proposed Amended Complaint)(SCILEPPI, LAURA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 3/28/2022. (mxw) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 3/28/2022. (ams, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: : A status conference is scheduled for June 22, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. Please dial (888) 684-8852 and enter access code 1364268. Prior to the conference, but no later than June 17, 2022, the parties shall file a joint letter not to exceed five (5) pages summarizing the status of the case, and any other issues that need to be addressed by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 3/28/2022. (smf) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte: Scheduling Conference held on 3/28/2022. The parties have engaged in preliminary settlement discussions and will engage in discovery pursuant to the March 28, 2022 Pretrial Scheduling Order. The Court has scheduled a status conference for June 22, 2022, at 10.00 a.m. (smf) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #17 Proposed Confidentiality Order filed by ZEIKOS INC. on 3/22/2022 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future filings of this nature, please select the event "Proposed Order" found under Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (ams, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Joint Discovery Plan by ZEIKOS INC..(SCILEPPI, LAURA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Protective Order by ZEIKOS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Confidentiality Order)(SCILEPPI, LAURA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee for William Dunnegan, Esq.: $ 150, receipt number NEW046398 (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to William Dunnegan, Esq. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 3/14/2022. (ams, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 The initial scheduling conference set for March 25, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. is rescheduled for March 28, 2022, at 2:30 p.m. Please dial (888) 684-8852 and enter access code 1364268. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than March 23, 2022. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found #here. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 3/10/2022. (smf) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Letter from Laura Scileppi. (SCILEPPI, LAURA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ZEIKOS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration OF LAURA SCILEPPI IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO ADMIT WILLIAM DUNNEGAN PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, #3 Declaration OF WILLIAM DUNNEGAN IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO ADMIT HIM PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(SCILEPPI, LAURA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer no longer assigned to the case. (adc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 4/4/2022 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 3/25/2022 at 2:00 p.m. The parties will dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 3/22/2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/1/2022. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALGREEN CO. identifying Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (YI, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by WALGREEN CO..(YI, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time for Walgreens to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 1/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/13/2021. (ams, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Update - The answer due date has been set for 1/21/2022. (ams, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Letter from Michael M. Yi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Stipulation and Order)(YI, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time for Walgreens to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 12/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/19/2021. (ams, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Update - The answer due date has been set for 12/17/2021 as to Walgreen Co. (ams, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Letter from Michael M. Yi, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Stipulation and Order)(YI, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to WALGREEN CO. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD WEISS on behalf of ZEIKOS INC. (WEISS, RICHARD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ZEIKOS INC. identifying n/a as Corporate Parent.. (SCILEPPI, LAURA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by ZEIKOS INC. as to WALGREEN CO.. (SCILEPPI, LAURA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WALGREEN CO. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12979728) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ZEIKOS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCILEPPI, LAURA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (ps) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/19/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeikos Inc. v. Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zeikos Inc.
Represented By: RICHARD WEISS
Represented By: LAURA J. SCILEPPI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: MICHAEL M. YI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: nefmednwk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?