Robinson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tawaii Miche Robinson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2023cv01123
Filed: February 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Young B Kim
Referring Judge: Nancy L Maldonado
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2023 Filing 13 CERTIFIED COPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Lindland, Kurt)
March 14, 2023 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: In light of the consent, the briefing schedule entered on February 24, 2023, (R. 7), is stricken. The government is ordered to file its answer by April 24, 2023. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is due by May 24, 2023. Plaintiff's brief in support of reversing the final agency decision must include a section with a recitation of the relevant facts and a separate section identifying the statement of the issues presented in the brief. The statement of issues must set out a numbered list of issues for the court's consideration. The issue statement must also identify with specificity the aspects of the Commissioner's final decision that Plaintiff challenges, along with a concise explanation of why Plaintiff believes the challenged aspects are unsupported by substantial evidence. The government's response and/or cross-motion for summary judgment is due by June 23, 2023. In the argument section of its response the government must address each issue Plaintiff identifies in his or her brief's statement of the issues. Plaintiff's reply is due by July 7, 2023, but one is not required. Mailed notice (ec)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Young B. Kim, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado on 3/10/23. (rp, )
March 10, 2023 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado:The parties filed a joint consent to exercise of jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge, this case will be reassigned. (ca, )
March 9, 2023 Filing 9 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Lindland, Kurt)
March 9, 2023 Filing 8 DESIGNATION of Kurt N. Lindland as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Lindland, Kurt)
February 24, 2023 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. Pursuant to Local Rule 4(b) and Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(a)(2), Defendant is to file its answer and administrative record no later than 04/24/2023. Plaintiff's brief in support of reversing or remanding the decision subject to review is due within 60 days of the filing of the administrative record. The Social Security Administration's response brief is due 45 days after Plaintiff's brief is filed. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, is due 14 days after Defendant's brief is filed. No oversized briefs will be allowed without prior court approval obtained at least one week before the due date and upon good cause shown. Counsel are further directed to meet and confer prior to the date the answer and administrative record are filed to determine whether: (a) the parties will agree to consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge, and (b) an agreed remand order is necessary. (ca, )
February 24, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tawaii Miche Robinson by Neil H. Good (Good, Neil)
February 23, 2023 Filing 5 The parties are required to provide notice of any prior case filed by Plaintiff that resulted in a remand for further administrative proceedings. If there was a prior remanded case that is not identified on the Civil Cover Sheet in this action, the parties are ordered to file a Notification of the prior case within 30 days. That Notification is to provide the case name, number and assigned judge. (kra, )
February 23, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tawaii Miche Robinson by Howard D. Olinsky (Olinsky, Howard)
February 23, 2023 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Tawaii Miche Robinson for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Olinsky, Howard)
February 23, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Olinsky, Howard)
February 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Tawaii Miche Robinson; (Olinsky, Howard)
February 23, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kra, )
February 23, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (kra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tawaii Miche Robinson
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Represented By: Neil H. Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kurt N. Lindland
Represented By: AUSA - SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?