Williams v. L'Oreal USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Katherine Williams
Defendant: L'Oreal USA Inc., L'oreal USA Products Inc, Dabur USA, Ltd, Dabur International LTD, Godrej SON Holdings, Inc, Namaste Laboratories LLC, Soft Sheen-Carson LLC, Dabur USA Inc and STRENGTH OF NATURE GLOBAL, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv01553
Filed: March 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2023 Filing 14 MDL Transfer In Letter to all Counsel of record. (aee, )
March 16, 2023 Filing 13 RECEIVED from Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:23-cv-00150 (aee).
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Transferring Case to JPML Court. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(JEG) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 3/16/2023.]
March 13, 2023 Filing 11 Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Minute Order NEF) (LLH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 3/16/2023.]
March 9, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Substitute Complaint and summons . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 3/16/2023.]
March 8, 2023 Filing 10 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Substitute #1 Complaint and summons by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Complaint, #2 Proposed Pleading; Summons, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Beh, Thomas) Modified on 3/9/2023 to edit title of document (JEG). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 3/16/2023.]
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff's #5 Motion to Substitute is GRANTED, and the Clerk of Court will substitute the corrected Complaint (R. Doc. 5-2) and its attachments (R. Docs. 5-3 to 5-11) in place of the original Complaint (R. Doc. 1) and its attachments (R. Docs. 1-1 to 1-9). Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 3/7/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 3/16/2023.]
March 3, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #6 Certificate of Interested Persons. Failure to add interested persons to CM/ECF upon filing of Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall add all interested persons listed on the certificate using the event Add Interested Person located under Notices in the CM/ECF system. (JEG) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 3/16/2023.]
March 3, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Substitute Complaint, summons and civil cover sheet . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 3/16/2023.]
March 2, 2023 Filing 7 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible case. Letter designated attachments sent via NEF. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet) (JEG) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 3/16/2023.]
March 2, 2023 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons by Katherine Williams (Beh, Thomas) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 3/16/2023.]
March 2, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Substitute Pleadings re #1 Complaint by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Revised Complaint, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Revised Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Revised Summons, #5 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Revised Summons, #6 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Revised Summons, #7 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Revised Summons, #8 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Revised Summons, #9 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Revised Summons, #10 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Revised Summons, #11 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Revised Summons)(Beh, Thomas) Modified on 3/3/2023 to edit title of document and to add linkage to document 1 (JEG). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 3/16/2023.]
March 1, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Dabur International, Ltd., Godrej Son Holdings, Inc., L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Soft Sheen Carson (W. I.), Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (JEG) (Main Document 4 replaced on 3/1/2023 to remove extra page) (JEG). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 3/16/2023.]
March 1, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of a summons for Strength of Nature, LLC and Dabur USA, LTD. The named person/entity is not reflected on the docket sheet as a party in the case. Therefore, summons will not be issued. (JEG) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 3/16/2023.]
March 1, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #1 Complaint. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. (JEG) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 3/16/2023.]
February 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2548363.), filed by Katherine Williams. (Attachments: #1 Attachment civil cover sheet, #2 Attachment Summons (Beh, Thomas) (Attachments 1-9 replaced on 3/1/2023 to flatten documents.) (JEG). ( #3 Attachment Summons, #4 Attachment Summons, #5 Attachment Summons, #6 Attachment Summons, #7 Attachment Summons, #8 Attachment Summons, #9 Attachment Summons). Modified on 3/7/2023 to replace documents as per Order #9 (LLH). Modified on 3/7/2023 to replace complaint (LLH). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 3/16/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. L'Oreal USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Williams
Represented By: Stephen B. Murray
Represented By: Stephen B. Murray, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Matthew Beh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'oreal USA Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dabur USA, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dabur International LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Godrej SON Holdings, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Namaste Laboratories LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soft Sheen-Carson LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dabur USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STRENGTH OF NATURE GLOBAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?