Believe Pursue LLC v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified in Schedule A to the Complaint
Plaintiff: Believe Pursue LLC
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified in Schedule A to the Complaint
Case Number: 1:2023cv02935
Filed: May 10, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. § 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2023 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Pursuant to the notice of voluntary dismissal #19 , this case is dismissed without prejudice. Any hearing dates and deadlines before this Court are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (mma, )
June 21, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Believe Pursue LLC of All Defendants on Schedule A to the Complaint (Defendant Nos. 1,2,3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 20, 21, 22, 23, 24, 25, 26, 27, 28, 29, 30, 31, 32, 33, 34, 35, 36, 37, 38, 39, 40, 41, 42, 43, 44, 45, 46, 47, 48, 49, 50, 51, 52, 53, 54, 55, 56, 57, 58, 59, 60, 61, 62, 63, 64, 65, 66, 67, 68, 69, 70, 71, 72, 73, 74, 75, 76, 77, 78, 79, 80, 81, 82, 83, 84, 85, 86 87, 88, 89, 90, 91, 92, 93, 94, 95, 96, 97, 98, 99, 100, 101, 102, 103, 104, 105, 106, 107, 108, 109, 110, 111, 112, 113, 114, 115, 116, 117, 118, 119, 120, 121, 122, 123, 124, 125, 126, 127, 128, 129, 130, 131, 132, 133, 134, 135, 136, 137, 138, 139, 140, 141, 142, 143, 144, 145, 146, 147, 148, and 149. (Hutchinson, David)
June 20, 2023 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion to withdraw appearance of attorney Anna Iskikian is granted. (mk)
June 20, 2023 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion by Attorney Anna Iskikian to withdraw as attorney for Believe Pursue LLC is granted #16 . (mk)
June 19, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION by Attorney Anna Iskikian to withdraw as attorney for Believe Pursue LLC. No party information provided (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in support of Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (Anna Iskikian), #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (Anna Iskikian))(Hutchinson, David)
June 15, 2023 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal and motion to file excess pages are granted. This is a lawsuit in which the plaintiff has named numerous defendants claiming, among other things, infringement of a design patent. A federal statute, 35 USC 299, limits the circumstances under which a patent holder may sue multiple defendants in a single lawsuit for patent infringement. Plaintiff has not addressed section 299 in its motion for temporary restraining order or supporting memorandum. Plaintiff is directed to file by 6/22/2023 a supplement to the motion for temporary restraining order explaining the basis upon which it may appropriately join multiple defendants on the patent infringement claims (which form part of the basis for the motion for a TRO). A telephonic status hearing, which the Court may vacate if it deems a hearing unnecessary, is set for 6/30/2023 at 9:10 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. (mk)
May 10, 2023 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Believe Pursue LLC by David Edward Hutchinson (Hutchinson, David)
May 10, 2023 Filing 13 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Believe Pursue LLC Ex. 3 (Parts 1 - 7 of 7) to Brett Beck Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 3 (Part 2 of 7) to Brett Beck Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. 3 (Part 3 of 7) to Brett Beck Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 (Part 4 of 7) to Brett Beck Declaration, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3 (Part 5 of 7) to Brett Beck Declaration, #5 Exhibit Ex. 3 (Part 6 of 7) to Brett Beck Declaration, #6 Exhibit Ex. 3 (Part 7 of 7) to Brett Beck Declaration)(Iskikian, Anna)
May 10, 2023 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Brett Beck (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex.1 to Brett Beck Declaration - Patent, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Brett Beck Declaration - Trademark)(Iskikian, Anna)
May 10, 2023 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Anna Iskikian in support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Anna Iskikian Declaration in support of Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Anna Iskikian Declaration in support of Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Anna Iskikian Declaration in support of Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Anna Iskikian Declaration of Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Anna Iskikian Declaration in support of Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 to Anna Iskikian Declaration in support of Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order)(Iskikian, Anna)
May 10, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Believe Pursue LLC for leave to file excess pages regarding Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order. (Iskikian, Anna)
May 10, 2023 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in support of Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Iskikian, Anna)
May 10, 2023 Filing 6 CLAIM by Believe Pursue LLC regarding Patent and Trademark. (Iskikian, Anna)
May 10, 2023 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Believe Pursue LLC (Iskikian, Anna)
May 10, 2023 Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Believe Pursue LLC Schedule A to Complaint. (Iskikian, Anna)
May 10, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Believe Pursue LLC by Anna Iskikian (Iskikian, Anna)
May 10, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Iskikian, Anna)
May 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Believe Pursue LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20624356. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex.1 to Complaint - Patent, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Complaint - Trademark, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Provisionally filed under Seal Schedule A to Complaint slipsheet)(Iskikian, Anna)
May 10, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
May 10, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Believe Pursue LLC v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified in Schedule A to the Complaint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Believe Pursue LLC
Represented By: David Edward Hutchinson
Represented By: Anna Iskikian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified in Schedule A to the Complaint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?