Abdeljaber et al v. Blinken et al
Plaintiff: Mohammad Abdeljaber and Reem Qadan
Defendant: Secretary of State Antony J. Blinken, Alejandro Mayorkas, Attorney General MERRICK B GARLAND, Antony J. Blinken and Merrick B. Garland
Case Number: 1:2023cv03348
Filed: May 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1651 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2023 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: The Court has reviewed the initial status report. Status hearing is reset for 9/5/2023 at 9:45 a.m. (to track the case only; no appearance is required). Joint status report due 8/29/2023. The Court will enter an order based on the report. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
June 28, 2023 Filing 5 Initial Status by Mohammad Abdeljaber, Reem Qadan (Kola, Isuf)
June 14, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Antony J. Blinken, Merrick B. Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, and U.S. Attorney General (jg, )
May 31, 2023 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Status hearing set for 7/5/2023 at 9:45 a.m. (to track the case only; no appearance is required). Joint status report due 6/28/2023. The Court will enter an order based on the report. Mailed notice. (pmh)
May 26, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Mohammad Abdeljaber, Reem Qadan by Isuf Kola (Kola, Isuf)
May 26, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kola, Isuf)
May 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Writ Of Mandamus and Exhibits filed by Mohammad Abdeljaber; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20678905. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kola, Isuf)
May 26, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jcc, )
May 26, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey I Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jcc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdeljaber et al v. Blinken et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Abdeljaber
Represented By: Isuf Kola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reem Qadan
Represented By: Isuf Kola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State Antony J. Blinken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General MERRICK B GARLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antony J. Blinken
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick B. Garland
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?