Ozcan v. Madsen et al
Plaintiff: Ihsan OZCAN
Defendant: Director KENNETH MADSEN, Director UR M JADDOU, Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas, Attorney General MERRICK B GARLAND, Director Christopher A. Wray, Kenneth Madsen, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Merrick Garland and Christopher A. Wray
Case Number: 1:2023cv03460
Filed: June 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2023 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Plaintiff's motion to dismiss #7 , which the court construes as a notice of voluntary dismissal under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i), is granted. Civil case terminated. (rao, )
July 26, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Ihsan Ozcan to dismiss (Seseri, Yllka)
June 22, 2023 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file an initial joint status report by 8/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Outline for the Initial Joint Status Report) (rao, )
June 22, 2023 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Merrick Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Kenneth Madsen, Alejandro Mayorkas, Christopher A. Wray (Treacy, Elizabeth)
June 22, 2023 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Merrick Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Kenneth Madsen, Alejandro Mayorkas, Christopher A. Wray (Oswald, Craig)
June 5, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ihsan Ozcan by Yllka Seseri 1:23-cv-03460 (Seseri, Yllka)
June 2, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to MERRICK B GARLAND, UR M JADDOU, KENNETH MADSEN, Alejandro Mayorkas, Christopher A. Wray, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (jcc, )
June 1, 2023 Filing 2 The parties are required to provide notice of any prior case filed by Plaintiff that resulted in a remand for further administrative proceedings. If there was a prior remanded case that is not identified on the Civil Cover Sheet in this action, the parties are ordered to file a Notification of the prior case within 30 days. That Notification is to provide the case name, number and assigned judge. (jcc, )
June 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 1:23-cv-03460 filed by Ihsan OZCAN; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20694571. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seseri, Yllka)
June 1, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jcc, )
June 1, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jcc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ozcan v. Madsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ihsan OZCAN
Represented By: Yllka Seseri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director KENNETH MADSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director UR M JADDOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General MERRICK B GARLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Christopher A. Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Madsen
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?