Trustees of the N.E.C.A. - IBEW Local 176 Health, Welfare, Pension, Vacation, and Training Trust Funds v. Twin Electric of Chicago, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Trustees of the N.E.C.A. - IBEW Local 176 Health, Welfare, Pension, Vacation, and Training Trust Funds
Defendant: Twin Electric of Chicago, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2023cv11171
Filed: September 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lindsay C Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the N.E.C.A. - IBEW Local 176 Health, Welfare, Pension, Vacation, and Training Trust Funds as to Twin Electric of Chicago, Ltd. on 10/7/2023, answer due 10/30/2023. (James, Brian)
September 20, 2023 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins: An in-person initial status hearing is set for 11/29/2023 at 9:15 a.m. in Courtroom 2119. Virtual hearing requests must be pre-approved by the Court. If you need to appear virtually, contact Judge Jenkins' courtroom deputy at least three business days in advance of the hearing to make the request. The parties are directed to file a joint Initial Status Report by 11/22/2023. The report should comply with the requirements set forth in the Initial Status Report standing order, which can be found at Judge Jenkins's web page @ http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The parties must follow all the standing orders for Judge Jenkins and all Local Rules, which can be found at the same web page. At the Initial Status hearing, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; and (3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 20, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Twin Electric of Chicago, Ltd. (smb, )
September 15, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (exr, )
September 15, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey I. Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (exr, )
September 13, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Trustees of the N.E.C.A. - IBEW Local 176 Health, Welfare, Pension, Vacation, and Training Trust Funds by Paul Michael Egan (Egan, Paul)
September 13, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Egan, Paul)
September 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Trustees of the N.E.C.A. - IBEW Local 176 Health, Welfare, Pension, Vacation, and Training Trust Funds; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21061738. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter of Assent)(Egan, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the N.E.C.A. - IBEW Local 176 Health, Welfare, Pension, Vacation, and Training Trust Funds v. Twin Electric of Chicago, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the N.E.C.A. - IBEW Local 176 Health, Welfare, Pension, Vacation, and Training Trust Funds
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Electric of Chicago, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?