Montgomery et al v. Young et al
Plaintiff: Darius Montgomery and Lora Snapp
Defendant: Timothy Young, Ryan Blaskey and City Of Aurora
Case Number: 1:2023cv15677
Filed: November 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2023 Filing 10 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
November 22, 2023 Filing 9 First AMENDED complaint by Darius Montgomery, Lora Snapp against All Defendants (Lipschultz, David)
November 20, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Darius Montgomery, Lora Snapp. Timothy Young waiver sent on 11/7/2023, answer due 1/8/2024. (Lipschultz, David)
November 20, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Darius Montgomery, Lora Snapp. Ryan Blaskey waiver sent on 11/7/2023, answer due 1/8/2024. (Lipschultz, David)
November 20, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Darius Montgomery, Lora Snapp. City Of Aurora waiver sent on 11/7/2023, answer due 1/8/2024. (Lipschultz, David)
November 20, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Ryan Blaskey, City Of Aurora, Timothy Young by Deborah Anne Ostvig (Ostvig, Deborah)
November 20, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Ryan Blaskey, City Of Aurora, Timothy Young by Michael E. Kujawa (Kujawa, Michael)
November 15, 2023 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling Conference is set for 2/13/2024 at 9:45 a.m. (to track the case only; no appearance is required). The joint Rule 26(f) planning report is due 2/6/2023. (The form of the report can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov.) The court will enter a schedule based on the report. Mailed notice. (pmh)
November 6, 2023 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Darius Montgomery, Lora Snapp by David Steven Lipschultz (Lipschultz, David)
November 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Darius Montgomery, Lora Snapp; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21300412. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lipschultz, David)
November 6, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mek,)
November 6, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (mek,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montgomery et al v. Young et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darius Montgomery
Represented By: David Steven Lipschultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lora Snapp
Represented By: David Steven Lipschultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Young
Represented By: Michael E. Kujawa
Represented By: Deborah Anne Ostvig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Blaskey
Represented By: Michael E. Kujawa
Represented By: Deborah Anne Ostvig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Aurora
Represented By: Michael E. Kujawa
Represented By: Deborah Anne Ostvig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?