The Fork Corner SAS v. Opinel SAS et al
Plaintiff: The Fork Corner SAS
Defendant: Opinel SAS, Opinel USA Inc. and Alexandre Delecroix
Case Number: 1:2023cv16187
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time #17 is granted. Defendants shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 1/30/24. If any motions to dismiss are filed on that day, responses will be due by 2/20/24 and replies will be due by 3/5/24. Mailed notice. (kp, )
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION by Defendants Alexandre Delecroix, Opinel SAS, Opinel USA Inc. for extension of time AGREED MOTION (Lasko, Bennett)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Agreed motion to enter joint stipulation #15 is granted. Mailed notice. (kp, )
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION by Defendants Alexandre Delecroix, Opinel SAS, Opinel USA Inc. for order Agreed Motion to enter Joint Stipulation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Stipulation)(Lasko, Bennett)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Defendants (Lasko, Bennett)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras:Motion(s) by attorney(s) Craig Wenner #6 , Katie Kavanaugh #10 , and Luke Williams #11 for leave to appear pro hac vice are granted. (rbf, )
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21427095. (Williams, Luke)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21427072. (Kavanaugh, Katie)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff The Fork Corner SAS regarding Complaint and Summonses served on Bennett Lasko on December 4, 2023 (Craig, Wenner)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Defendants' agreed motion to set schedule #7 is granted. Defendants shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 1/23/24. If any motions to dismiss are filed on that day, responses will be due by 2/13/24 and replies will be due by 2/27/24. (rbf, )
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION by Defendants Alexandre Delecroix, Opinel SAS, Opinel USA Inc. to set a briefing schedule AGREED MOTION to set dates for Answer/Plead and set briefing schedule (Lasko, Bennett)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21423867. (Craig, Wenner)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Alexandre Delecroix, Opinel SAS, Opinel USA Inc. by Bennett W. Lasko (Lasko, Bennett)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mcp, )
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (mcp, )
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The Fork Corner SAS (Kucera, John)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The Fork Corner SAS by John Jacob Kucera (Kucera, John)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kucera, John)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by The Fork Corner SAS; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21355997.(Kucera, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Fork Corner SAS v. Opinel SAS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fork Corner SAS
Represented By: John Jacob Kucera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opinel SAS
Represented By: Bennett W. Lasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opinel USA Inc.
Represented By: Bennett W. Lasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandre Delecroix
Represented By: Bennett W. Lasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?