Trustees of the N.E.C.A. - IBEW Local 176 Health, Welfare, Pension, Vacation and Training Trust Funds v. Integrated Electrical Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Trustees of the N.E.C.A. - IBEW Local 176 Health, Welfare, Pension, Vacation and Training Trust Funds
Defendant: Integrated Electrical Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv17132
Filed: December 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2024 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report on this court's form by 3/8/2024. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Joint Status Report) (cn).
January 23, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Integrated Electrical Services, LLC(Miller, Todd)
January 11, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the N.E.C.A. - IBEW Local 176 Health, Welfare, Pension, Vacation and Training Trust Funds as to Integrated Electrical Services, LLC on 1/3/2024, answer due 1/24/2024. (Egan, Paul)
December 29, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Integrated Electrical Services, LLC by Todd Abraham Miller (Miller, Todd)
December 29, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Integrated Electrical Services, LLC by Kathleen Marie Cahill (Cahill, Kathleen)
December 29, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Integrated Electrical Services, LLC by Megan Marie Moore (Moore, Megan)
December 28, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Trustees of the N.E.C.A. - IBEW Local 176 Health, Welfare, Pension, Vacation and Training Trust Funds by Paul Michael Egan (Egan, Paul)
December 28, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Egan, Paul)
December 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Trustees of the N.E.C.A. - IBEW Local 176 Health, Welfare, Pension, Vacation and Training Trust Funds; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21461867. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter of Assent)(Egan, Paul)
December 28, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Integrated Electrical Services, LLC (axa, )
December 28, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 3). (mek,)
December 28, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mek,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the N.E.C.A. - IBEW Local 176 Health, Welfare, Pension, Vacation and Training Trust Funds v. Integrated Electrical Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the N.E.C.A. - IBEW Local 176 Health, Welfare, Pension, Vacation and Training Trust Funds
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrated Electrical Services, LLC
Represented By: Todd Abraham Miller
Represented By: Megan Marie Moore
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?