Mitchell et al v. Mendoza et al
Plaintiff: Michael J. Mitchell and Crystal A. Mitchell
Defendant: Jose A Mendoza and The Sygma Network, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv17169
Filed: December 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 11 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Crystal A. Mitchell, Michael J. Mitchell (McDivitt, Jay)
January 26, 2024 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Attorney Jay McDivitt's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #8 is granted. Mailed notice. (ym)
January 25, 2024 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Crystal A. Mitchell, Michael J. Mitchell by Torrie Nicole Poplin (Poplin, Torrie)
January 17, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21528668. (McDivitt, Jay)
January 2, 2024 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (rc, )
January 2, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (rc, )
December 29, 2023 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Status hearing is set for 3/7/2024 at 9:00 AM as an in-person hearing. Defendant(s) is directed to advise the Plaintiff(s) of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. If the parties agree to consent jurisdiction before the Magistrate Judge, all parties must sign the consent form and electronically file the signed form on the case docket. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym)
December 29, 2023 Filing 5 STATEMENT by Defendant The Sygma Network, Inc. for disclosure (Lane, Jamie) (Docket Text modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 1/2/2024 (rc, ).
December 29, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jose A Mendoza, The Sygma Network, Inc. by Emily Everden (Everden, Emily)
December 29, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jose A Mendoza, The Sygma Network, Inc. by Jamie Sean Lane (Lane, Jamie)
December 29, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, LAW Division, case number (2023 L 010626) filed by Jose A Mendoza, The Sygma Network, Inc. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21472736. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A thru H)(Lane, Jamie)
December 29, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lane, Jamie)
December 29, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (mek,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell et al v. Mendoza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Mitchell
Represented By: Timothy Michael Whiting
Represented By: Torrie Nicole Poplin
Represented By: Jay Michael McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal A. Mitchell
Represented By: Timothy Michael Whiting
Represented By: Jay Michael McDivitt
Represented By: Torrie Nicole Poplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose A Mendoza
Represented By: Emily Everden
Represented By: Jamie Sean Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sygma Network, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Everden
Represented By: Jamie Sean Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?