Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund et al v. IDI Interiors, LLC
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund and Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund
Defendant: IDI Interiors, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv01119
Filed: February 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2024 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: The Court has reviewed the status report. Status on audit remains due on 5/30/24. #10 Mailed notice. (dm, )
April 3, 2024 Filing 13 STATUS Report by Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund (James, Brian)
March 22, 2024 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund regarding order #11 (James, Brian)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 3/21/2024. Mailed notice. (dm, )
March 21, 2024 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Plaintiffs' motion of Default and Audit order is granted. Enter Order. Plaintiffs are to file a status report by 5/30/24. Mailed notice. (dm, )
March 18, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund for order of Default and Audit Order (James, Brian)
February 21, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund as to IDI Interiors, LLC on 2/15/2024, answer due 3/7/2024. (James, Brian)
February 12, 2024 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 4/3/24, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at #http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice (cn).
February 9, 2024 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant IDI Interiors, LLC (axk, )
February 8, 2024 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund by James R. Anderson (Anderson, James)
February 8, 2024 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund by Grant Piechocinski (Piechocinski, Grant)
February 8, 2024 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund by Paul Michael Egan (Egan, Paul)
February 8, 2024 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund by Brian Christopher James (James, Brian)
February 8, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (James, Brian)
February 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21620823. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum of Painting Agreement)(James, Brian)
February 8, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (evw, )
February 8, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 3). (evw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund et al v. IDI Interiors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund
Represented By: Grant Piechocinski
Represented By: James R. Anderson
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Represented By: Brian Christopher James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund
Represented By: Grant Piechocinski
Represented By: James R. Anderson
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Represented By: Brian Christopher James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund
Represented By: Grant Piechocinski
Represented By: James R. Anderson
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Represented By: Brian Christopher James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund
Represented By: Grant Piechocinski
Represented By: James R. Anderson
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Represented By: Brian Christopher James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund
Represented By: Grant Piechocinski
Represented By: James R. Anderson
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Represented By: Brian Christopher James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund
Represented By: Grant Piechocinski
Represented By: James R. Anderson
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Represented By: Brian Christopher James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDI Interiors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?