Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund et al v. J.L.D.C. Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund and Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund
Defendant: J.L.D.C. Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv01750
Filed: March 1, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lindsay C Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund as to J.L.D.C. Construction, Inc. on 3/22/2024, answer due 4/12/2024. (James, Brian)
March 26, 2024 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins: In person initial status hearing set for June 6, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2119. Initial Status Report shall be filed by May 29, 2024. The report should comply with the requirements set forth in the Initial Status Report standing order, which can be found at Judge Jenkins's web page @ (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov, "District Judges", to "Judge Lindsay Jenkins", to "Initial Status Hearings" under Case Management Procedures"). The parties must follow all the standing orders for Judge Jenkins and all Local Rules, which can be found at the same web page. At the Initial Status hearing, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; and (3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 4, 2024 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant J.L.D.C. Construction, Inc. (axa, )
March 1, 2024 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund by James R. Anderson (Anderson, James)
March 1, 2024 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund by Grant Piechocinski (Piechocinski, Grant)
March 1, 2024 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund by Paul Michael Egan (Egan, Paul)
March 1, 2024 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund by Brian Christopher James (James, Brian)
March 1, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (James, Brian)
March 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21696268. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum of Agreement)(James, Brian)
March 1, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ksr, )
March 1, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 3). (ksr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund et al v. J.L.D.C. Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund
Represented By: Grant Piechocinski
Represented By: James R. Anderson
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Represented By: Brian Christopher James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Represented By: Brian Christopher James
Represented By: Grant Piechocinski
Represented By: James R. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Savings Fund
Represented By: Grant Piechocinski
Represented By: James R. Anderson
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Represented By: Brian Christopher James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund
Represented By: Grant Piechocinski
Represented By: James R. Anderson
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Represented By: Brian Christopher James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund
Represented By: Grant Piechocinski
Represented By: James R. Anderson
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Represented By: Brian Christopher James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund
Represented By: Grant Piechocinski
Represented By: James R. Anderson
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Represented By: Brian Christopher James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.L.D.C. Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?