Schultz et al v. Gree USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Brian Schultz, Emily Joy Schultz, Joanna Sheeley and Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, Ltd.
Defendant: Gree USA, Inc., Gree Electric Appliances Inc. Of Zhuhai, MJC America, Ltd. and MJC America Holdings Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv02343
Filed: March 21, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2024 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Gree Electric Appliances Inc. Of Zhuhai, Gree USA, Inc., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, Ltd., MJC America Holdings Co., Inc., MJC America, Ltd. by Stephan Alexander Skiniotes (Skiniotes, Stephan)
May 1, 2024 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Gree Electric Appliances Inc. Of Zhuhai, Gree USA, Inc., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, Ltd., MJC America Holdings Co., Inc., MJC America, Ltd. (jmv, )
April 18, 2024 Filing 9 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to MJC America Holdings Co., Inc. on 04/18/2024 by Plaintiffs Emily Joy Schultz, Robert Brian Schultz, Joanna Sheeley. Waiver of service due by 5/20/2024. (Spencer, Brian)
April 18, 2024 Filing 8 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to MJC America, Ltd. on 4/18/2024 by Plaintiffs Emily Joy Schultz, Robert Brian Schultz, Joanna Sheeley. Waiver of service due by 5/20/2024. (Spencer, Brian)
April 18, 2024 Filing 7 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, Ltd. on 4/18/2024 by Plaintiffs Emily Joy Schultz, Robert Brian Schultz, Joanna Sheeley. Waiver of service due by 6/17/2024. (Spencer, Brian)
April 18, 2024 Filing 6 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai on 04/18/2024 by Plaintiffs Emily Joy Schultz, Robert Brian Schultz, Joanna Sheeley. Waiver of service due by 6/17/2024. (Spencer, Brian)
April 18, 2024 Filing 5 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Gree USA, Inc. on 04/18/2024 by Plaintiffs Emily Joy Schultz, Robert Brian Schultz, Joanna Sheeley. Waiver of service due by 5/20/2024. (Spencer, Brian)
April 17, 2024 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Emily Joy Schultz, Robert Brian Schultz, Joanna Sheeley by Brian James Spencer (Spencer, Brian)
April 11, 2024 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 6/18/2024 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 6/13/2024. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Virtual hearings must be pre-approved by the Court. If you need to appear virtually, send the attached form to Judge Kendall's courtroom deputy. The courtroom deputy will inform you as to whether your request has been approved.Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Virtual Hearing Request Form) (lk, )
March 22, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (vkm, )
March 22, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (vkm, )
March 21, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Spencer, Brian)
March 21, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joanna Sheeley, Emily Joy Schultz, Robert Brian Schultz; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21773208. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Facts, #2 Exhibit Recalls, #3 Exhibit Information, #4 Exhibit Deferred Prosecution Agreement, #5 Exhibit Plea Agreement, #6 Exhibit Jury Demand)(Spencer, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schultz et al v. Gree USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Brian Schultz
Represented By: Brian James Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Joy Schultz
Represented By: Brian James Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Sheeley
Represented By: Brian James Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree USA, Inc.
Represented By: Stephan Alexander Skiniotes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree Electric Appliances Inc. Of Zhuhai
Represented By: Stephan Alexander Skiniotes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC America, Ltd.
Represented By: Stephan Alexander Skiniotes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC America Holdings Co., Inc.
Represented By: Stephan Alexander Skiniotes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?