Spurr v. Greenline Loans et al
Plaintiff: Mary Spurr
Defendant: Jessi Lee Phillips Lorenzo, Greenline Loans, Waawaatesi LLC, Jessi Phillips Lorenzo, Jessi Lee Phillips, LDF Holdings, LLC and John Does 1-20
Case Number: 1:2024cv03614
Filed: May 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey I Cummings
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2024 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Mary Spurr. Jessi Lee Phillips Lorenzo waiver sent on 6/21/2024, answer due 8/20/2024. (Edelman, Daniel)
June 24, 2024 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Mary Spurr. LDF Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 6/21/2024, answer due 8/20/2024. (Edelman, Daniel)
June 24, 2024 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Mary Spurr. Waawaatesi LLC waiver sent on 6/21/2024, answer due 8/20/2024. (Edelman, Daniel)
June 10, 2024 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mary Spurr by Lucas Coughlin (Coughlin, Lucas)
May 7, 2024 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey I Cummings: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Jeffrey I. Cummings. On or before 7/8/24, the parties shall file a joint initial status report in accordance with the template available on the Court's website under the case management procedure titled "Initial Status Report for Newly Filed Cases." The parties shall also review all of the case management procedures and standing orders available on the Court's website, including the Court's case management procedure for motions to dismiss. Initial tracking status hearing set for 7/19/24 at 9:00 a.m. to track the case only (no appearance is required and the case will not be called). Instead, the Court will review the parties' joint initial status report and enter further orders as appropriate. Mailed notice (cc, )
May 6, 2024 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Greenline Loans, LDF Holdings, LLC, Jessi Lee Phillips Lorenzo, Waawaatesi LLC (jmv, )
May 3, 2024 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mary Spurr by Tara Leigh Goodwin (Goodwin, Tara)
May 3, 2024 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mary Spurr by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel)
May 3, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Edelman, Daniel)
May 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Complaint - Class Action) filed by Mary Spurr; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21928948. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Edelman, Daniel)
May 3, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jxm, )
May 3, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jeffrey I Cummings. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 1). (jxm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spurr v. Greenline Loans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessi Lee Phillips Lorenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenline Loans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waawaatesi LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessi Phillips Lorenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessi Lee Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LDF Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Spurr
Represented By: Tara Leigh Goodwin
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Represented By: Lucas Coughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?