Mercis B.V. v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Plaintiff: Mercis B.V.
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto, Guangzhou Happy Credit Apparel CO., Ltd, Guangzhou Happy Partner Garments CO., Ltd, Ruidianzi, Jingzhou Heightening Knitting Garments Co., Ltd., Wee!, Uma hana Sg, Song Brothers, guangjun, Fancy Lifestyle Products, Easy Life, ChineseShop, babenbake, Zhuhai Yi Zhen Industrial Co., Ltd., Zhuhai Duoyingbao Network Technology Co., Ltd., Zhengzhou Yangluo Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd., Zhengzhou Sanrenxing Trading Limited Company, Zhejiang Yuchen Network Technology Co., Ltd., Zhejiang Qianshun Technology Co., Ltd., Zhejiang Ningbo Chumian Commodity Co., Ltd., Zhangjiagang Omanda Imp& Exp Co., Ltd., Yiwu Zunda Trading Co., Ltd., Yiwu Yuandian Import And Export Co., Ltd., Yiwu Yimu Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd., Yiwu Xiangliang Import And Export Co., Ltd., Yiwu Vanho Garment Factory, Yiwu Pingyu Trade Co., Ltd., Yiwu Mingdu E-Commerce Firm, Yiwu Linghong Sanitary Ware Co., Ltd., Yiwu Gif Fashion Accessories Co., Ltd., Yiwu Board Trading Co., Ltd., Yangzhou Detuo Trading Co., Ltd., Yancheng Dreamon Toys Co., Ltd., Wuxi Xinya Micro Fibrous Co., Ltd., Wuxi East-Sunshine Textile Science And Technology Co., Ltd., Wuhan Jumeng Kids Toys Co., Ltd., Wuhan Hanyang Nike Department Store Sales Department (individual Business), Suzhou Zaiyou Textile Co., Ltd., Suzhou Mygreen Textiles Co., Ltd., Shishi Every Step The Road Apparel Trading Limited, Shijiazhuang Tonghong Trading Co., Ltd., Shijiazhuang Kuoya Import & Export Co., Ltd., Shijiazhuang Boyvda Trading Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Tianxingyi Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Tianchenxing Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Ji Mi Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Hongdingtian Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Fangyuanxiang Clothing Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Digiway Electronics Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Dacheng Mingde Cultural Products Co., Ltd., Shaoxing Keqiao Liguotai Imp & Exp Co., Ltd., Shangqiu Lechang Clothing Co., Ltd., Shangqiu Kaixintianguo Apparel Co., Ltd., Shangqiu Hengsong Clothing Co., Ltd., Shangqiu City Monday Trade Co., Ltd., Shanghai Yihengze Technology Co., Ltd., Shanghai Shengyunxiang International Trade Co., Ltd., Shanghai Longbai Plastic Toys Co., Ltd., Shandong Xingyue Textile Co., Ltd., Sanming Lemeng Trading Co., Ltd., Rushi Hebei Textile Manufacturing Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Xiami Baby Products Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Erier Trading Co., Ltd., Qingdao Tongyize Clothing Co., Ltd., Qingdao Enwei International Trading Co., Ltd., Qingdao Banaba Manufacture Tools Ltd., Puning City Dam Wheat Clothing Business Department, Ningbo J-Lead Int'l Trading Co., Ltd., Ningbo DS Imp & Exp Co., Ltd., Nantong Rebirth Queen Artware Co., Ltd., Nanping Yanping District Lufa Trading Co., Ltd., Nanjing Qiannuo Information Technology Co., Ltd., Nanjing Olive Textiles Co., Ltd., Lanxi Yiliya Textile Co., Ltd., Lanxi Lujia Knitwear Co., Ltd., Jinzhou Runhe Textile Co., Ltd., Jinzhou City Shengshun Towel Factory, Jinhua Sandi Import And Export Co., Ltd., Hunan Sushan Import And Export Co., Ltd., Hunan Qianzi Garment Co., Ltd., Hunan Mishan Technology Co., Ltd., Henan Boders Industrial Limited Company, Hefei Shengke Textile Co., Ltd., Hefei Fengsida Trading Co., Ltd., Hebei Xiongan Tongqu Trading Co., Ltd., Hebei Sipanuo Felt Products Co., Ltd., Hebei Runan Technology Co., Ltd., Hebei Angtian Textile Trading Co., Ltd., Hangzhou Tino Art-Textile Co., Ltd., Hangzhou Kangman Textile Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Xinli Network Technology Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Ningxin Textile Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Langai E-Commerce Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Huanyang Fashion Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Happy Partner Garments Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Happy Credit Apparel Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Chengmaomao Trading Co., Ltd., Gaoyang Youdi Textile Manufacturing Co., Ltd., Gaoyang Wuzhou Textiles Factory, Fujian Jinghui Investment Co., Ltd., Dongguan Yisuntex E-Commerce Co., Ltd., Dongguan Unique And Me Technology Co., Ltd., Dongguan Kaisen Jewelry Industry Co., Ltd., Dongguan Hongxing Wooden Craft Co., Ltd., Anyang Meiya Clothing Co., Ltd., ytkids, Xu793737893, Xinjiamei, Viki9411, ultraweek, squishies Store, sightly, partysuppliesnew, newkeygood Store, happybarry, Allseasonsyy, aliceer, xianyi house Store, Shang Hai HuangSuYing Shop Store, RoyalShine Store, NuoYing Store, multicolour Store, Free baking mold shop, DSRAY Store, Children Happy Toy Store, Buddinfant Official Store, Xiangcheng Nisai Trading Co., Ltd., shoe bags, OEIPSMK-LF, Mulin Greening Engineering, lxooo, Lovely Billie, LJLongtr, letmeedee, Legend Home, LAOXU SHOP, HATAMOTO STORE, Grey990, Dstro, DAIMWEN, BYKOINE-US, BINBIN BU, ADD-HGL, SKYLA_Design, johenakotakd, Carlyn_nabell, taron-store, moon_dealz, lidohada-0, Yiwu Dingyi E-Commerce Co., Ltd., Dongguan XUQY Technology Co., Ltd., Yiwu Wanqing Arts & Crafts Co., Ltd., Yiwu Flowers Sweet Maternal And Infant Supplies Co., Ltd., Supstory Store, Shop4854001 Store, Whoseeps, tapelaobienb, Sevenmotor123, RICHARDKEITHTHORP, Megan M Martin, kukorsigauds, joningoran, JeremyLynnBlumenshine, JacqulynMartinez, hmdn, Garylowareng, ElysiaPHendersonDouvia, custom-designs, BethJustina, Aloons96, Ab Rok, samiralturi, quality-store-222, natarempe0, lico-8094 and itziko179
Case Number: 1:2024cv03780
Filed: May 9, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2024 Filing 55 Notice of Settlement by Mercis B.V. (Hierl, Michael)
July 1, 2024 Filing 54 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's Motions to exceed page limitation #48 #51 are granted. Plaintiff's Opposed motion for a first extension of time to file a reply in support of its motion for entry of a preliminary injunction as to Defendant No. 49 "Ruidianzi" [Dkt. No. 39] #50 is granted. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
June 28, 2024 NEW PARTIES: Guangzhou Langai E-Commerce Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Huanyang Fashion Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Happy Partner Garments Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Happy Credit Apparel Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Chengmaomao Trading Co., Ltd., Gaoyang Youdi Textile Manufacturing Co., Ltd., Gaoyang Wuzhou Textiles Factory, Fujian Jinghui Investment Co., Ltd., Dongguan Yisuntex E-Commerce Co., Ltd., Dongguan Unique And Me Technology Co., Ltd., Dongguan Kaisen Jewelry Industry Co., Ltd., Dongguan Hongxing Wooden Craft Co., Ltd., Anyang Meiya Clothing Co., Ltd., ytkids, Xu793737893, Xinjiamei, Viki9411, ultraweek, squishies Store, sightly, partysuppliesnew, newkeygood Store, happybarry, Allseasonsyy, aliceer, xianyi house Store, Shang Hai HuangSuYing Shop Store, RoyalShine Store, NuoYing Store, multicolour Store, Free baking mold shop, DSRAY Store, Children Happy Toy Store, Buddinfant Official Store, Xiangcheng Nisai Trading Co., Ltd., shoe bags, OEIPSMK-LF, Mulin Greening Engineering, lxooo, Lovely Billie, LJLongtr, letmeedee, Legend Home, LAOXU SHOP, HATAMOTO STORE, Grey990, Dstro, DAIMWEN, BYKOINE-US, BINBIN BU, ADD-HGL, SKYLA_Design, johenakotakd, Carlyn_nabell, taron-store, moon_dealz, lidohada-0, Yiwu Dingyi E-Commerce Co., Ltd., Dongguan XUQY Technology Co., Ltd., Yiwu Wanqing Arts & Crafts Co., Ltd., Yiwu Flowers Sweet Maternal And Infant Supplies Co., Ltd., Supstory Store, Shop4854001 Store, Whoseeps, tapelaobienb, Sevenmotor123, RICHARDKEITHTHORP, Megan M Martin, kukorsigauds, joningoran, JeremyLynnBlumenshine, JacqulynMartinez, hmdn, Garylowareng, ElysiaPHendersonDouvia, custom-designs, BethJustina, Aloons96, Ab Rok, samiralturi, quality-store-222, natarempe0, lico-8094 and itziko179 added to case caption. (Hierl, Michael)
June 28, 2024 NEW PARTIES: Wee!, Uma hana Sg, Song Brothers, guangjun, Fancy Lifestyle Products, Easy Life, ChineseShop, babenbake, Zhuhai Yi Zhen Industrial Co., Ltd., Zhuhai Duoyingbao Network Technology Co., Ltd., Zhengzhou Yangluo Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd., Zhengzhou Sanrenxing Trading Limited Company, Zhejiang Yuchen Network Technology Co., Ltd., Zhejiang Qianshun Technology Co., Ltd., Zhejiang Ningbo Chumian Commodity Co., Ltd., Zhangjiagang Omanda Imp& Exp Co., Ltd., Yiwu Zunda Trading Co., Ltd., Yiwu Yuandian Import And Export Co., Ltd., Yiwu Yimu Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd., Yiwu Xiangliang Import And Export Co., Ltd., Yiwu Vanho Garment Factory, Yiwu Pingyu Trade Co., Ltd., Yiwu Mingdu E-Commerce Firm, Yiwu Linghong Sanitary Ware Co., Ltd., Yiwu Gif Fashion Accessories Co., Ltd., Yiwu Board Trading Co., Ltd., Yangzhou Detuo Trading Co., Ltd., Yancheng Dreamon Toys Co., Ltd., Wuxi Xinya Micro Fibrous Co., Ltd., Wuxi East-Sunshine Textile Science And Technology Co., Ltd., Wuhan Jumeng Kids Toys Co., Ltd., Wuhan Hanyang Nike Department Store Sales Department (individual Business), Suzhou Zaiyou Textile Co., Ltd., Suzhou Mygreen Textiles Co., Ltd., Shishi Every Step The Road Apparel Trading Limited, Shijiazhuang Tonghong Trading Co., Ltd., Shijiazhuang Kuoya Import & Export Co., Ltd., Shijiazhuang Boyvda Trading Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Tianxingyi Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Tianchenxing Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Ji Mi Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Hongdingtian Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Fangyuanxiang Clothing Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Digiway Electronics Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Dacheng Mingde Cultural Products Co., Ltd., Shaoxing Keqiao Liguotai Imp & Exp Co., Ltd., Shangqiu Lechang Clothing Co., Ltd., Shangqiu Kaixintianguo Apparel Co., Ltd., Shangqiu Hengsong Clothing Co., Ltd., Shangqiu City Monday Trade Co., Ltd., Shanghai Yihengze Technology Co., Ltd., Shanghai Shengyunxiang International Trade Co., Ltd., Shanghai Longbai Plastic Toys Co., Ltd., Shandong Xingyue Textile Co., Ltd., Sanming Lemeng Trading Co., Ltd., Rushi Hebei Textile Manufacturing Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Xiami Baby Products Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Erier Trading Co., Ltd., Qingdao Tongyize Clothing Co., Ltd., Qingdao Enwei International Trading Co., Ltd., Qingdao Banaba Manufacture Tools Ltd., Puning City Dam Wheat Clothing Business Department, Ningbo J-Lead Int'l Trading Co., Ltd., Ningbo DS Imp & Exp Co., Ltd., Nantong Rebirth Queen Artware Co., Ltd., Nanping Yanping District Lufa Trading Co., Ltd., Nanjing Qiannuo Information Technology Co., Ltd., Nanjing Olive Textiles Co., Ltd., Lanxi Yiliya Textile Co., Ltd., Lanxi Lujia Knitwear Co., Ltd., Jinzhou Runhe Textile Co., Ltd., Jinzhou City Shengshun Towel Factory, Jinhua Sandi Import And Export Co., Ltd., Hunan Sushan Import And Export Co., Ltd., Hunan Qianzi Garment Co., Ltd., Hunan Mishan Technology Co., Ltd., Henan Boders Industrial Limited Company, Hefei Shengke Textile Co., Ltd., Hefei Fengsida Trading Co., Ltd., Hebei Xiongan Tongqu Trading Co., Ltd., Hebei Sipanuo Felt Products Co., Ltd., Hebei Runan Technology Co., Ltd., Hebei Angtian Textile Trading Co., Ltd., Hangzhou Tino Art-Textile Co., Ltd., Hangzhou Kangman Textile Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Xinli Network Technology Co., Ltd. and Guangzhou Ningxin Textile Co., Ltd. added to case caption. (Hierl, Michael)
June 26, 2024 Filing 53 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mercis B.V. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 91 (Hierl, Michael)
June 26, 2024 Filing 52 REPLY by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Entry of a Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant No. 49 "RUIDIANZI" (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Hierl, Michael)
June 26, 2024 Filing 51 MOTION by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. for leave to file excess pages Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limitation (Hierl, Michael)
June 25, 2024 Filing 50 MOTION by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. for extension of time Plaintiff's Opposed Motion for a First Extension of Time to File a Reply in Support of its Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction as to Defendant No. 49 "RUIDIANZI" [Dkt. No. 39] (Hierl, Michael)
June 25, 2024 Filing 49 REPLY by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Entry of a Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Nos. 82 "GUANGZHOU HAPPY CREDIT APPAREL CO., LTD." and 83 "GUANGZHOU HAPPY PARTNER GARMENTS CO., LTD." (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Hierl, Michael)
June 25, 2024 Filing 48 MOTION by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. for leave to file excess pages Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limitation (Hierl, Michael)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PRELIMINARY Injunction Order. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 6/18/2024. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic motion hearing held. Plaintiff's replies to Defendant Ruidianzi's Opposition to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #39 and Defendants Guangzhou Happy Credit Apparel Co., Ltd. & Guangzhou Happy Partner Garments Co., Ltd's Memorandum in opposition to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #40 shall be filed by 6/25/24. Plaintiff's response to Defendant Jingzhou Heightening Knitting Garments Co., Ltd.'s Motion to dismiss #44 shall be filed by 7/9/24; Defendant's reply shall be filed by 7/16/24. Plaintiff's Motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #33 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. The Clerk is directed to unseal all previously sealed documents. Plaintiff is ordered to add all Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
June 18, 2024 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM by Jingzhou Heightening Knitting Garments Co., Ltd. in Opposition to motion for preliminary injunction #33 (Solter, Benjamin)
June 18, 2024 Filing 44 MOTION by Defendant Jingzhou Heightening Knitting Garments Co., Ltd. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to Preliminary Injunction)(Solter, Benjamin)
June 17, 2024 Filing 43 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mercis B.V. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Certain Defendants (Hierl, Michael)
June 12, 2024 Filing 42 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jingzhou Heightening Knitting Garments Co., Ltd. by Benjamin Solter (Solter, Benjamin)
June 12, 2024 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mercis B.V. as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto on 6/6/2024, answer due 6/27/2024. (Hierl, Michael)
June 10, 2024 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM by Guangzhou Happy Credit Apparel CO., Ltd, Guangzhou Happy Partner Garments CO., Ltd in Opposition to motion for preliminary injunction #33 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Declaration Joint Decl. of Zhu & Tang)(Zhou, Huicheng)
June 10, 2024 Filing 39 RESPONSE by Defendant Ruidianzi to motion for preliminary injunction #33 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration of Yingzhong Que)(Urbanczyk, Adam)
June 10, 2024 Filing 38 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ruidianzi by Adam Edward Urbanczyk (Urbanczyk, Adam)
June 10, 2024 Filing 37 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Motion hearing previously set for 6/11/24 is stricken and reset to telephonic motion hearing on 6/18/24 at 9:30 a.m. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
June 6, 2024 Filing 36 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #33 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 6/11/2024 at 09:30 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
June 6, 2024 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Michael A. Hierl regarding motion for preliminary injunction #33 (Hierl, Michael)
June 6, 2024 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM by Mercis B.V. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #33 (Hierl, Michael)
June 6, 2024 Filing 33 MOTION by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. for preliminary injunction Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction (Hierl, Michael)
June 6, 2024 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto (lm, )
May 31, 2024 Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Guangzhou Happy Credit Apparel CO., Ltd, Guangzhou Happy Partner Garments CO., Ltd by Huicheng Zhou (Zhou, Huicheng)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic status hearing held. Telephonic motion hearing held. Plaintiff's Ex-Parte Motion to extend the temporary restraining order #28 is granted. The temporary restraining order is extended for 14 days through 6/11/24. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
May 22, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of extension of time #28 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/28/2024 at 09:30 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
May 22, 2024 Filing 28 MOTION by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. for extension of time Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order (Hierl, Michael)
May 21, 2024 Filing 30 CIVIL BOND in the amount of $ 173,000 posted by Mercis B.V. (Document not Imaged). (gcy, )
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SEALED TEMPORARY Restraining Order. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/14/2024. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic motion hearing held. Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file under seal #7 is granted. Plaintiff's Motion to exceed page limitation #10 is granted. Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary asset restraint, expedited discovery, and service of process by email and/or electronic publication #11 is granted. Enter Sealed Temporary Restraining Order. Telephonic status hearing set for 5/28/24 at 9:30 a.m. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
May 14, 2024 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic motion hearing set for 5/14/24 at 9:30 a.m. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
May 10, 2024 Filing 24 MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (jb, )
May 9, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order, #11 , motion for leave to file excess pages #10 , motion to seal document #7 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/14/2024 at 09:30 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
May 9, 2024 Filing 22 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Mercis B.V. (Hierl, Michael)
May 9, 2024 Filing 21 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Exhibit 3 Part 9 of Padberg Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
May 9, 2024 Filing 20 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Exhibit 3 Part 8 of Padberg Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
May 9, 2024 Filing 19 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Exhibit 3 Part 7 of Padberg Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
May 9, 2024 Filing 18 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Exhibit 3 Part 6 of Padberg Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
May 9, 2024 Filing 17 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Exhibit 3 Part 5 of Padberg Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
May 9, 2024 Filing 16 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Exhibit 3 Part 4 of Padberg Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
May 9, 2024 Filing 15 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Exhibit 3 Part 3 of Padberg Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
May 9, 2024 Filing 14 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Exhibit 3 Part 2 of Padberg Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
May 9, 2024 Filing 13 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Exhibit 3 Part 1 of Padberg Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
May 9, 2024 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by Mercis B.V. in support of motion for temporary restraining order, #11 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Padberg Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Declaration Hierl Declaration, #5 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 4)(Hierl, Michael)
May 9, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. for temporary restraining order Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and Service of Process by Email and/or Electronic Publication (Hierl, Michael)
May 9, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. for leave to file excess pages Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limitation (Hierl, Michael)
May 9, 2024 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Mercis B.V. (Hierl, Michael)
May 9, 2024 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael)
May 9, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael)
May 9, 2024 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mercis B.V. by John Wilson (Wilson, John)
May 9, 2024 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mercis B.V. by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert)
May 9, 2024 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mercis B.V. by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William)
May 9, 2024 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mercis B.V. by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
May 9, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
May 9, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mercis B.V.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21947194. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hierl, Michael)
May 9, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (jmv, )
May 9, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jmv, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mercis B.V. v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercis B.V.
Represented By: John Wilson
Represented By: Robert Payton Mcmurray
Represented By: William Benjamin Kalbac
Represented By: Michael A. Hierl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guangzhou Happy Credit Apparel CO., Ltd
Represented By: Huicheng Zhou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guangzhou Happy Partner Garments CO., Ltd
Represented By: Huicheng Zhou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruidianzi
Represented By: Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jingzhou Heightening Knitting Garments Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Benjamin Solter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wee!
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uma hana Sg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Song Brothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: guangjun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fancy Lifestyle Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easy Life
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ChineseShop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: babenbake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhuhai Yi Zhen Industrial Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhuhai Duoyingbao Network Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhengzhou Yangluo Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhengzhou Sanrenxing Trading Limited Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhejiang Yuchen Network Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhejiang Qianshun Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhejiang Ningbo Chumian Commodity Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhangjiagang Omanda Imp& Exp Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yiwu Zunda Trading Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yiwu Yuandian Import And Export Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yiwu Yimu Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yiwu Xiangliang Import And Export Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yiwu Vanho Garment Factory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yiwu Pingyu Trade Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yiwu Mingdu E-Commerce Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yiwu Linghong Sanitary Ware Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yiwu Gif Fashion Accessories Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yiwu Board Trading Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yangzhou Detuo Trading Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yancheng Dreamon Toys Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wuxi Xinya Micro Fibrous Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wuxi East-Sunshine Textile Science And Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wuhan Jumeng Kids Toys Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wuhan Hanyang Nike Department Store Sales Department (individual Business)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzhou Zaiyou Textile Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzhou Mygreen Textiles Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shishi Every Step The Road Apparel Trading Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shijiazhuang Tonghong Trading Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shijiazhuang Kuoya Import & Export Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shijiazhuang Boyvda Trading Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Tianxingyi Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Tianchenxing Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Ji Mi Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Hongdingtian Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Fangyuanxiang Clothing Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Digiway Electronics Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Dacheng Mingde Cultural Products Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaoxing Keqiao Liguotai Imp & Exp Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shangqiu Lechang Clothing Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shangqiu Kaixintianguo Apparel Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shangqiu Hengsong Clothing Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shangqiu City Monday Trade Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanghai Yihengze Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanghai Shengyunxiang International Trade Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanghai Longbai Plastic Toys Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shandong Xingyue Textile Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanming Lemeng Trading Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushi Hebei Textile Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanzhou Xiami Baby Products Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanzhou Erier Trading Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qingdao Tongyize Clothing Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qingdao Enwei International Trading Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qingdao Banaba Manufacture Tools Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puning City Dam Wheat Clothing Business Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ningbo J-Lead Int'l Trading Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ningbo DS Imp & Exp Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nantong Rebirth Queen Artware Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanping Yanping District Lufa Trading Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanjing Qiannuo Information Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanjing Olive Textiles Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lanxi Yiliya Textile Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lanxi Lujia Knitwear Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jinzhou Runhe Textile Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jinzhou City Shengshun Towel Factory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jinhua Sandi Import And Export Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunan Sushan Import And Export Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunan Qianzi Garment Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunan Mishan Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henan Boders Industrial Limited Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hefei Shengke Textile Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hefei Fengsida Trading Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hebei Xiongan Tongqu Trading Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hebei Sipanuo Felt Products Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hebei Runan Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hebei Angtian Textile Trading Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hangzhou Tino Art-Textile Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hangzhou Kangman Textile Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guangzhou Xinli Network Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guangzhou Ningxin Textile Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guangzhou Langai E-Commerce Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guangzhou Huanyang Fashion Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guangzhou Happy Partner Garments Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guangzhou Happy Credit Apparel Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guangzhou Chengmaomao Trading Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaoyang Youdi Textile Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaoyang Wuzhou Textiles Factory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fujian Jinghui Investment Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dongguan Yisuntex E-Commerce Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dongguan Unique And Me Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dongguan Kaisen Jewelry Industry Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dongguan Hongxing Wooden Craft Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anyang Meiya Clothing Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ytkids
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xu793737893
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xinjiamei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viki9411
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ultraweek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: squishies Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sightly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: partysuppliesnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: newkeygood Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: happybarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allseasonsyy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: aliceer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xianyi house Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shang Hai HuangSuYing Shop Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RoyalShine Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NuoYing Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: multicolour Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Free baking mold shop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSRAY Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Children Happy Toy Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buddinfant Official Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiangcheng Nisai Trading Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shoe bags
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OEIPSMK-LF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mulin Greening Engineering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lxooo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lovely Billie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LJLongtr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: letmeedee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legend Home
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAOXU SHOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HATAMOTO STORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grey990
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dstro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAIMWEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BYKOINE-US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BINBIN BU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADD-HGL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SKYLA_Design
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: johenakotakd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlyn_nabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: taron-store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: moon_dealz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lidohada-0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yiwu Dingyi E-Commerce Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dongguan XUQY Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yiwu Wanqing Arts & Crafts Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yiwu Flowers Sweet Maternal And Infant Supplies Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supstory Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop4854001 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whoseeps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tapelaobienb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sevenmotor123
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARDKEITHTHORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan M Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kukorsigauds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: joningoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JeremyLynnBlumenshine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JacqulynMartinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hmdn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garylowareng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ElysiaPHendersonDouvia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: custom-designs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BethJustina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aloons96
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ab Rok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: samiralturi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: quality-store-222
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: natarempe0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lico-8094
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: itziko179
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?