BBLI Edison LLC v. City of Chicago
Plaintiff: BBLI Edison LLC
Defendant: City Of Chicago
Case Number: 1:2024cv04925
Filed: June 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY by BBLI Edison LLC to response in opposition to motion #15 , MOTION by Plaintiff BBLI Edison LLC for temporary restraining order #7 (Houck, Cara)
July 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE by City Of Chicagoin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff BBLI Edison LLC for temporary restraining order #7 (Garrity, Jackson)
July 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: The Court grants Defendant City of Chicago's motion to extend time to answer or otherwise plead #13 to 8/21/24. Mailed notice. (dm, )
July 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for extension of time to file responsive pleading to Amended Complaint (Garrity, Jackson)
July 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Status hearing held. The Court heard argument from the parties regarding Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order. Defendant's response is due 7/25/24. Plaintiff's reply is due 7/29/24. The court will set the matter for hearing after a review of parties' briefs. Mailed notice. (dm, )
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Ellen Wight Mclaughlin (Mclaughlin, Ellen)
July 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Amie Leann Medley (Medley, Amie)
July 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order #7 . The Court sets a status hearing for 7/15/24 at 1:30 pm. Mailed notice. (dm, )
July 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED complaint by BBLI Edison LLC against City Of Chicago (Houck, Cara)
July 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff BBLI Edison LLC for temporary restraining order (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A)(Houck, Cara)
July 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Jackson P. Garrity (Garrity, Jackson)
June 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff BBLI Edison LLC regarding Affidavit of Service of Summons in a Civil Case and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Served Upon City of Chicago served on City of Chicago on 6/18/2024 (Houck, Cara)
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 8/27/24, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, )
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant City Of Chicago (jxm, )
June 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff BBLI Edison LLC, a Delaware limited liability company by Cara M. Houck (Houck, Cara)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Houck, Cara)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by BBLI Edison LLC, a Delaware limited liability company; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22141138. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Houck, Cara)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (evw, )
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (evw,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BBLI Edison LLC v. City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Chicago
Represented By: Jackson P. Garrity
Represented By: Ellen Wight Mclaughlin
Represented By: Amie Leann Medley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BBLI Edison LLC
Represented By: Cara M. Houck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?