Shenzhen JianYuanDa Mirror Technology Co., Ltd. v. The Entities and Individuals Identified in Annex A
Plaintiff: Shenzhen JianYuanDa Mirror Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant: The Entities and Individuals Identified in Annex A
Case Number: 1:2024cv07581
Filed: August 22, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2024 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Second motion for leave to file under seal #14 is granted. Docket entries #2 , #6 , #7 , #12 and #13 will remain under seal. Mailed notice. (cp, )
October 11, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiff Shenzhen JianYuanDa Mirror Technology Co., Ltd. to seal documents (Lei, Ge)
October 11, 2024 Filing 13 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Shenzhen JianYuanDa Mirror Technology Co., Ltd. Second Motion for Alternative Service (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Lei, Ge)
October 11, 2024 Filing 12 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Shenzhen JianYuanDa Mirror Technology Co., Ltd. Second Motion for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order, including a temporary injunction, temporary asset restraint, and limited expedited discovery (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Lei, Ge)
September 23, 2024 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Parties are to submit a written status report by 11/25/2024. Mailed notice. (cp, )
September 10, 2024 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: In-person motion hearing held. Plaintiff's counsel was present. As explained at the hearing, the court is uncertain that Plaintiff's design patent meets statutory requirements of novelty, originality, and non-functional purposes; the court is thus reluctant to grant the substantial remedy of an asset freeze without notice to Defendants. Plaintiff's ex parte motion for entry of temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, temporary asset restraint, and expedited discovery #6 , motion for alternative service #7 , and motion to file under seal #8 are denied. Mailed notice. (cp, )
September 3, 2024 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: On the court's own motion, an in-person hearing is set for 9/10/2024 at 10:30 a.m. in courtroom 2503 regarding Motions #6 #7 #8 . Mailed notice. (cp, )
August 22, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Shenzhen JianYuanDa Mirror Technology Co., Ltd. to seal documents (Lei, Ge)
August 22, 2024 Filing 7 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Shenzhen JianYuanDa Mirror Technology Co., Ltd. for Alternative Service (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Lei, Ge)
August 22, 2024 Filing 6 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Shenzhen JianYuanDa Mirror Technology Co., Ltd. for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order, including a temporary injunction, temporary asset restraint, and limited expedited discovery (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Lei, Ge)
August 22, 2024 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Shenzhen JianYuanDa Mirror Technology Co., Ltd. by Ge Lei (Lei, Ge)
August 22, 2024 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Shenzhen JianYuanDa Mirror Technology Co., Ltd. (Lei, Ge)
August 22, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lei, Ge)
August 22, 2024 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Shenzhen JianYuanDa Mirror Technology Co., Ltd. Sealed Complaint (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Lei, Ge)
August 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Shenzhen JianYuanDa Mirror Technology Co., Ltd.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22391719.(Lei, Ge)
August 22, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (man, )
August 22, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Keri L. Holleb Hotaling. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 1). (man, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shenzhen JianYuanDa Mirror Technology Co., Ltd. v. The Entities and Individuals Identified in Annex A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Entities and Individuals Identified in Annex A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shenzhen JianYuanDa Mirror Technology Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Ge Lei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?