Sega Corporation v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Plaintiff: Sega Corporation
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto and The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Amended Schedule A Hereto
Case Number: 1:2024cv10460
Filed: October 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: April M Perry
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2024 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable April M. Perry: This case having been recently reassigned to Judge April M. Perry, Plaintiff is asked to file an Initial Status Report by 12/17/24 consistent with the criteria listed on Judge Perry's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order #11 , which was filed prior to the removal of more than 150 Defendants from the complaint, is denied without prejudice. Should Plaintiff wish to move for a TRO with the current set of Defendants, it is welcome to renew the motion with a refined set of exhibits and notice the motion for presentment based upon the Court's calendar on its website. Mailed notice. (jcc, )
November 26, 2024 Filing 28 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 24-0032: IT APPEARING THAT, the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable April M. Perry; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 290 cases be reassigned to the Honorable April M. Perry; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable April M. Perry's webpage on the Court's website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order will not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable April M. Perry to the Court's civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable April M. Perry to the Court's criminal case assignment system ninety (90) days so that Judge Perry shall thereafter receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable April M. Perry for all further proceedings. Honorable Georgia N Alexakis no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 11/26/2024.(td, )
November 15, 2024 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM by Sega Corporation Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Joinder (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael)
November 15, 2024 Filing 26 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Sega Corporation Amended Schedule A (Hierl, Michael)
November 15, 2024 Filing 25 AMENDED complaint by Sega Corporation against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Amended Schedule A Hereto (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael)
October 18, 2024 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Georgia N Alexakis: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #7 and motion to exceed page limitation #10 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for an ex parte temporary restraining order #11 is taken under advisement. Upon review of the complaint, the Court sua sponte raises the propriety of joining 170 defendants #8 in a single action involving 14 trademark registrations #22 . See, e.g., Estee Lauder Cosmetics Ltd. v. Schedule A, 334 F.R.D. 182 (N.D. Ill. 2020). By 11/15/24, plaintiff must file a supplemental memorandum addressing the propriety of joinder in light of the principles described in Estee Lauder. Plaintiff may also want to review the Court's order in Bug Art Limited v. The Partnerships, 24 CV 7777, Dkt. 28, where the Court expressed its joinder-related concerns in cases of this size and type and also discussed its expectation that plaintiffs pinpoint those portions of voluminous records (e.g., Dkt. 13-21) that support a plaintiff's joinder-related assertions. In the alternative, plaintiff has leave to file an amended complaint by 11/15/24 with a smaller subset of defendants along with a memorandum explaining why each defendant is properly joined to all of the others. Estee Lauder, 334 F.R.D. at 189. No appearance is required on 10/21/24. (ca, )
October 16, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order, #11 , motion to seal document #7 , motion for leave to file excess pages #10 before Honorable Georgia N Alexakis on 10/21/2024 at 09:30 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
October 16, 2024 Filing 22 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Sega Corporation (Hierl, Michael)
October 16, 2024 Filing 21 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Sega Corporation Exhibit 2 part 9 of Paragoso Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 16, 2024 Filing 20 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Sega Corporation Exhibit 2 part 8 of Paragoso Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 16, 2024 Filing 19 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Sega Corporation Exhibit 2 part 7 of Paragoso Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 16, 2024 Filing 18 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Sega Corporation Exhibit 2 part 6 of Paragoso Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 16, 2024 Filing 17 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Sega Corporation Exhibit 2 part 5 of Paragoso Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 16, 2024 Filing 16 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Sega Corporation Exhibit 2 part 4 of Paragoso Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 16, 2024 Filing 15 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Sega Corporation Exhibit 2 part 3 of Paragoso Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 16, 2024 Filing 14 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Sega Corporation Exhibit 2 part 2 of Paragoso Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 16, 2024 Filing 13 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Sega Corporation Exhibit 2 part 1 of Paragoso Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
October 16, 2024 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by Sega Corporation in support of motion for temporary restraining order, #11 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Paragoso Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration Hierl Declaration, #4 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 4)(Hierl, Michael)
October 16, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Sega Corporation for temporary restraining order Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and Service of Process by Email and/or Electronic Publication (Hierl, Michael)
October 16, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Sega Corporation for leave to file excess pages Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limitation (Hierl, Michael)
October 16, 2024 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Sega Corporation (Hierl, Michael)
October 16, 2024 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Sega Corporation Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael)
October 16, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Sega Corporation to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael)
October 16, 2024 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sega Corporation by John Wilson (Wilson, John)
October 16, 2024 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sega Corporation by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert)
October 16, 2024 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sega Corporation by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William)
October 16, 2024 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sega Corporation by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
October 16, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
October 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sega Corporation; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22609218. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael)
October 16, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (axk, )
October 16, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Georgia N Alexakis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Keri L. Holleb Hotaling. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (axk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sega Corporation v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Amended Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sega Corporation
Represented By: Michael A. Hierl
Represented By: William Benjamin Kalbac
Represented By: Robert Payton Mcmurray
Represented By: John Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?