Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Plaintiff: Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto, Shop1103842654 Store, Shaoxing Bestshow Textile Co., Ltd., Shop1103887718 Store, Sweetdream Store, Shop1103562129 Store, Guangzhou Youpin Textile Co., Ltd., Shop1103333728 Store, kahire, Su Jiu High Quality Store, Yiwu Kaixi Imp. & Exp. Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Caluz Trading Co., Ltd., NANJING TRUEJOIN INTERNATIONAL TRADING CO,. LTD, Shop1102772717 Store, Chengdu Paideng Clothing Limited Liability Company, Shop1102883199 Store, Shop1103587552 Store, Xiamen Ubagift Trading Co., Ltd., Shop1103478535 Store, Guangzhou Feizhenzouxian Clothing Co., Ltd., MAYSUN HK LIMITED, Sombrero Store, The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified in Amended Schedule A Hereto, YourDesignOrMine2020, naokahdesigns, Rainbow Fabrics, Digitaling 01 Store, Zerofux Clothing Co, The New Shirt Shop, ali hat Store, Lucky Monkey Apparel, Peace Love Clothing Store, Ethereal 428 Store, MINISO BASEBALL Store, Shop1103895031 Store, Cgrahamstudio, RunQiu01 Store, Kucci Store, Shop1104028427 Store, Shop1102770421 Store, Mu Tong 1 Store, CS Hats Store, C-2 RISE Store, BC Australia, mamoic, Halloween Merch, Customization Trend and Arrow Trend Leggings
Case Number: 1:2024cv10628
Filed: October 17, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2024 Filing 47 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), this case is dismissed with prejudice as to defendants Lux Outlet Store, Blue Drop Transfers, and Strong N Free only. Mailed notice. (ym)
December 9, 2024 NEW PARTIES: Zerofux Clothing Co, The New Shirt Shop, Strong N Free, Rainbow Fabrics, naokahdesigns, Lucky Monkey Apparel, Blue Drop Transfers, BC Australia, mamoic, Halloween Merch, Customization Trend and Arrow Trend Leggings added to case caption. (Hierl, Michael)
December 6, 2024 Filing 46 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Certain Defendants (Hierl, Michael)
December 6, 2024 Filing 45 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 12/6/2024. Mailed notice. (ym)
December 6, 2024 Filing 44 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 12/6/2024. Defendants did not appear nor contact the Court. Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction against certain defendants #37 is granted. Enter Order. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to unseal plaintiff's Amended Schedule A to the Amended Complaint #13 , Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Sean Gorman [17, 18, 19, 20] and the Temporary Restraining Order #25 . An in-person status hearing is set for 2/7/2025 at 10:15 AM. Law Firm of Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd. is ordered to add ALL Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website located at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_cmecf/pdfs/v60/Add_Terminate_Instructions.pdf. Mailed notice. (ym)
December 6, 2024 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), this case is dismissed without prejudice as to defendants teepeoples, Joe Joe Monkey, and Young Rebels Clothing UK only. Mailed notice. (ym)
December 5, 2024 Filing 42 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Certain Defendants (Hierl, Michael)
December 5, 2024 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified in Amended Schedule A Hereto on 12/2/2024, answer due 12/23/2024. (Hierl, Michael)
December 2, 2024 Filing 40 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #37 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 12/6/2024 at 10:45 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
December 2, 2024 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Michael A. Hierl regarding motion for preliminary injunction #37 (Hierl, Michael)
December 2, 2024 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC in support of motion for preliminary injunction #37 (Hierl, Michael)
December 2, 2024 Filing 37 MOTION by Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC for preliminary injunction Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction (Hierl, Michael)
November 26, 2024 NEW PARTIES: Lux Outlet Store, Yiwu Kaixi Imp. & Exp. Co., Ltd., Xiamen Ubagift Trading Co., Ltd., Shaoxing Bestshow Textile Co., Ltd., NANJING TRUEJOIN INTERNATIONAL TRADING CO,. LTD, MAYSUN HK LIMITED, kahire, Guangzhou Youpin Textile Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Feizhenzouxian Clothing Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Caluz Trading Co., Ltd., Chengdu Paideng Clothing Limited Liability Company, Sweetdream Store, Su Jiu High Quality Store, Sombrero Store, Shop1103887718 Store, Shop1103842654 Store, Shop1103587552 Store, Shop1103562129 Store, Shop1103478535 Store, Shop1103333728 Store, Shop1102883199 Store, Shop1102772717 Store, Shop1102770421 Store, RunQiu01 Store, Peace Love Clothing Store, Mu Tong 1 Store, MINISO BASEBALL Store, Kucci Store, Ethereal 428 Store, CS Hats Store, C-2 RISE Store, ali hat Store, YourDesignOrMine2020, Cgrahamstudio, Shop1104028427 Store, Shop1103895031 Store and Digitaling 01 Store added to case caption. (Hierl, Michael)
November 22, 2024 Filing 36 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 11/22/2024. Mailed notice. (ym)
November 22, 2024 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 11/22/2024. Defendants did not appear nor contact the Court. Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction against certain defendants #30 is granted. Enter Order. Oral motion by plaintiff to extend the temporary restraining order on the remaining 15 defendants not included in the preliminary injunction is granted. The Temporary Restraining Order as to the 15 defendants not included in the preliminary injunction is extended to 12/10/2024. An in-person status hearing is set for 12/6/2024 at 10:45 AM. Law Firm of Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd. is ordered to add ALL Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website located at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_cmecf/pdfs/v60/Add_Terminate_Instructions.pdf. Mailed notice. (ym)
November 21, 2024 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified in Amended Schedule A Hereto on 11/19/2024, answer due 12/10/2024. (Hierl, Michael)
November 19, 2024 Filing 33 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #30 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 11/22/2024 at 10:15 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
November 19, 2024 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Michael A. Hierl regarding motion for preliminary injunction #30 (Hierl, Michael)
November 19, 2024 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC in support of motion for preliminary injunction #30 (Hierl, Michael)
November 19, 2024 Filing 30 MOTION by Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC for preliminary injunction Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction (Hierl, Michael)
November 19, 2024 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified in Amended Schedule A Hereto (lj, )
November 12, 2024 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 11/12/2024. Plaintiff's ex parte motion to extend the temporary restraining order #27 is granted. The Temporary Restraining Order is extended to 11/26/2024. An in-person status hearing is set for 11/22/2024 at 10:15 AM. Mailed notice. (ym)
November 7, 2024 Filing 28 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of extension of time #27 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 11/12/2024 at 10:00 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
November 7, 2024 Filing 27 MOTION by Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC for extension of time Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order (Hierl, Michael)
November 5, 2024 Filing 26 SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000 posted by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC. (Document not imaged) (nsf, )
October 29, 2024 Filing 25 SEALED ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 10/29/2024. Mailed notice. (ym)
October 29, 2024 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 10/29/2024. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #7 , motion to exceed page limitation #14 , and ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary asset restraint, expedited discovery, and service of process by email and/or electronic publication #15 are granted. Enter Order. An in-person status hearing is set for 11/12/2024 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym)
October 24, 2024 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Joinder (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael)
October 24, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion to seal document #7 , motion for leave to file excess pages #14 , motion for temporary restraining order, #15 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 10/29/2024 at 10:00 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
October 24, 2024 Filing 21 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC (Hierl, Michael)
October 24, 2024 Filing 20 EXHIBIT 3 Part 4 of Gorman Declaration by Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC (Hierl, Michael) Modified on 12/6/2024 (jn, ).
October 24, 2024 Filing 19 EXHIBIT 3 Part 3 of Gorman Declaration by Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC (Hierl, Michael) Modified on 12/6/2024 (jn, ).
October 24, 2024 Filing 18 EXHIBIT 3 Part 2 of Gorman Declaration by Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC (Hierl, Michael) Modified on 12/6/2024 (jn, ).
October 24, 2024 Filing 17 EXHIBIT 3 Part 1 of Gorman Declaration by Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC (Hierl, Michael) Modified on 12/6/2024 (jn, ).
October 24, 2024 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC in support of motion for temporary restraining order, #15 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Gorman Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2 Part 1, #4 Exhibit 2 Part 2, #5 Declaration Hierl Declaration, #6 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 4)(Hierl, Michael)
October 24, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC for temporary restraining order Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and Service of Process by Email and/or Electronic Publication (Hierl, Michael)
October 24, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC for leave to file excess pages Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limitation (Hierl, Michael)
October 24, 2024 Filing 13 AMENDED Schedule A by Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC (Hierl, Michael) Modified on 12/6/2024 (jn, ).
October 24, 2024 Filing 12 AMENDED complaint by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified in Amended Schedule A Hereto (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 Part 1, #3 Exhibit 2 Part 2)(Hierl, Michael)
October 18, 2024 Filing 11 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (jh, )
October 18, 2024 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Plaintiff is put on notice that it may be required to file a memorandum discussing the propriety of joinder under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 20(a)(2) if it appears that defendants are too numerous or unconnected. In addition, should default judgment enter against defendant(s), Plaintiff should be prepared to prove up damages by affidavit or hearing. Mailed notice. (ym)
October 17, 2024 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC (Hierl, Michael)
October 17, 2024 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael)
October 17, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael)
October 17, 2024 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC by John Wilson (Wilson, John)
October 17, 2024 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert)
October 17, 2024 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William)
October 17, 2024 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
October 17, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
October 17, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22616047. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 Part 1, #3 Exhibit 2 Part 2)(Hierl, Michael)
October 17, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (axk, )
October 17, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (axk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop1103842654 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaoxing Bestshow Textile Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop1103887718 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweetdream Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop1103562129 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guangzhou Youpin Textile Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop1103333728 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kahire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Su Jiu High Quality Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yiwu Kaixi Imp. & Exp. Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guangzhou Caluz Trading Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANJING TRUEJOIN INTERNATIONAL TRADING CO,. LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop1102772717 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chengdu Paideng Clothing Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop1102883199 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop1103587552 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiamen Ubagift Trading Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop1103478535 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guangzhou Feizhenzouxian Clothing Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYSUN HK LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sombrero Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified in Amended Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YourDesignOrMine2020
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: naokahdesigns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rainbow Fabrics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digitaling 01 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zerofux Clothing Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New Shirt Shop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ali hat Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucky Monkey Apparel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peace Love Clothing Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethereal 428 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINISO BASEBALL Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop1103895031 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cgrahamstudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RunQiu01 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kucci Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop1104028427 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop1102770421 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mu Tong 1 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CS Hats Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C-2 RISE Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BC Australia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mamoic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halloween Merch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Customization Trend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrow Trend Leggings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Those Characters from Cleveland, LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Hierl
Represented By: William Benjamin Kalbac
Represented By: Robert Payton Mcmurray
Represented By: John Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?