Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Plaintiff: Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp.
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Case Number: 1:2024cv11696
Filed: November 14, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2025 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 89 (Hierl, Michael)
December 20, 2024 Filing 32 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/20/2024: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 17, 2024 Filing 31 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (smb, )
December 17, 2024 Filing 30 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (smb, )
December 15, 2024 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Telephonic hearing set for 2/13/2025 at 9:15 a.m. on the Webex platform. Parties will not be asked to start their video. Counsel of record and other essential case participants will receive an email prior to the start of the hearing with instructions to join the hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Emailed notice (cn).
November 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/21/2024. Emailed notice (cn).
November 21, 2024 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's Motions for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) #12 and for Expedited Discovery #13 are granted. Enter order. Emailed notice (cn).
November 21, 2024 Filing 26 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. Exhibit 2 Part 12 of Li Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
November 21, 2024 Filing 25 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. Exhibit 2 Part 11 of Li Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
November 21, 2024 Filing 24 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. Exhibit 2 Part 10 of Li Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
November 21, 2024 Filing 23 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. Exhibit 2 Part 9 of Li Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
November 21, 2024 Filing 22 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. Exhibit 2 Part 8 of Li Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
November 21, 2024 Filing 21 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. Exhibit 2 Part 7 of Li Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
November 21, 2024 Filing 20 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. Exhibit 2 Part 6 of Li Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
November 21, 2024 Filing 19 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. Exhibit 2 Part 5 of Li Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
November 21, 2024 Filing 18 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. Exhibit 2 Part 4 of Li Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
November 21, 2024 Filing 17 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. Exhibit 2 Part 3 of Li Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
November 21, 2024 Filing 16 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. Exhibit 2 Part 2 of Li Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
November 21, 2024 Filing 15 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. Exhibit 2 Part 1 of Li Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
November 21, 2024 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Eric Li (Hierl, Michael)
November 21, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. to expedite Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery (Hierl, Michael)
November 21, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. Plaintiff's Motion for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Hierl, Michael)
November 14, 2024 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #7 is granted. Emailed notice (cn).
November 14, 2024 Filing 10 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. (Hierl, Michael)
November 14, 2024 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. (Hierl, Michael)
November 14, 2024 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael)
November 14, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael)
November 14, 2024 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. by John Wilson (Wilson, John)
November 14, 2024 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert)
November 14, 2024 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William)
November 14, 2024 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
November 14, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
November 14, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22724890. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael)
November 14, 2024 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (rjm, )
November 14, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (rjm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp. v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bestway Inflatables & Material Corp.
Represented By: Michael A. Hierl
Represented By: William Benjamin Kalbac
Represented By: Robert Payton Mcmurray
Represented By: John Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?