Mercis B.V. v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Plaintiff: Mercis B.V.
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Case Number: 1:2025cv00380
Filed: January 14, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2025 Filing 48 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic status hearing held on 3/10/2025 and continued to 4/15/2025 at 8:50 a.m. Plaintiff is directed to file a status report by 4/8/2025. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 650-479-3207; access code 2305-915-8729. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (mma, )
February 21, 2025 Filing 47 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER: Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/21/2025. Mailed notice. (mma, )
February 21, 2025 Filing 46 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic status hearing held on 2/21/2025. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction against certain defendants #37 is granted. Enter preliminary injunction order. The temporary restraining order previously entered by the Court is extended as to the remaining defendants to 3/10/2025. The case is set for a telephonic status hearing on 3/10/2025 at 8:55 a.m. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 650-479-3207; access code 2305-915-8729. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (mma, )
February 19, 2025 Filing 45 STATUS Report by Mercis B.V. (Hierl, Michael)
February 13, 2025 Filing 44 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion for a second extension of the temporary restraining order #42 is granted; the TRO previously entered by the Court is extended through 2/21/2025. The telephonic preliminary injunction hearing set for 2/14/2025 is vacated and reset to 2/21/2025 at 8:50 AM. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 650-479-3207; access code 2305-915-8729. Plaintiff is directed to file on 2/19/2025 a status report regarding the matters addressed in the motion for extension of the TRO. (mk)
February 13, 2025 Filing 43 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Exhibit A (Hierl, Michael)
February 13, 2025 Filing 42 MOTION by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. for extension of time Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Hierl, Michael)
February 12, 2025 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mercis B.V. as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto on 2/11/2025, answer due 3/4/2025. (Hierl, Michael)
February 11, 2025 Filing 40 SUMMONS Issued (Court Participant) as to Defendant The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto (men, )
February 11, 2025 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Michael A. Hierl regarding motion for preliminary injunction #37 (Hierl, Michael)
February 11, 2025 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM by Mercis B.V. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #37 (Hierl, Michael)
February 11, 2025 Filing 37 MOTION by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. for preliminary injunction Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction Against Certain Defendants (Hierl, Michael)
January 29, 2025 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion for extension of the temporary restraining order #34 is granted; the ex parte TRO entered on 1/17/2025 is extended through 2/14/2025. The telephonic preliminary injunction hearing set for 2/4/2025 is vacated and reset to 2/14/2025 at 9:05 AM. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 650-479-3207; access code 2305-915-8729. Motion for preliminary injunction must be filed by 2/11/2025. Any motion for preliminary injunction filed in this case must be accompanied by a certificate stating upon whom and how the motion has been served. The Court also advises that it will not enter a preliminary injunction order unless in its judgment it believes that defendants have had sufficient notice of the lawsuit via electronic service of summons (not just the preliminary injunction motion). (mk)
January 29, 2025 Filing 34 MOTION by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. for extension of time Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order (Hierl, Michael)
January 23, 2025 Filing 33 SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by Mercis B.V. (tg, )
January 17, 2025 Filing 32 SEALED ORDER: Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/17/2025. (mma, )
January 17, 2025 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #7 and motion to file excess pages #13 are granted. Plaintiff's ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order (etc.) #14 is also granted. Enter Sealed Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order. Telephonic preliminary injunction hearing is set for 2/4/2025 at 8:55 AM. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 650-479-3207; access code 2305-915-8729. Motion for preliminary injunction or motion to extend TRO must be filed by 1/30/2025. Any motion for preliminary injunction filed in this case must be accompanied by a certificate stating upon whom and how the motion has been served. The Court also advises that it will not enter a preliminary injunction order unless in its judgment it believes that defendants have had sufficient notice of the lawsuit via electronic service of summons (not just the preliminary injunction motion). Mailed notice. (mma, )
January 16, 2025 Filing 30 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Mercis B.V. (Hierl, Michael)
January 16, 2025 Filing 29 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Exhibit 3 Part 14 of Padberg Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
January 16, 2025 Filing 28 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Exhibit 3 Part 13 of Padberg Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
January 16, 2025 Filing 27 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Exhibit 3 Part 12 of Padberg Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
January 16, 2025 Filing 26 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Exhibit 3 Part 11 of Padberg Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
January 16, 2025 Filing 25 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Exhibit 3 Part 10 of Padberg Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
January 16, 2025 Filing 24 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Exhibit 3 Part 9 of Padberg Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
January 16, 2025 Filing 23 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Exhibit 3 Part 8 of Padberg Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
January 16, 2025 Filing 22 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Exhibit 3 Part 7 of Padberg Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
January 16, 2025 Filing 21 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Exhibit 3 Part 6 of Padberg Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
January 16, 2025 Filing 20 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Exhibit 3 Part 5 of Padberg Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
January 16, 2025 Filing 19 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Exhibit 3 Part 4 of Padberg Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
January 16, 2025 Filing 18 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Exhibit 3 Part 3 of Padberg Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
January 16, 2025 Filing 17 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Exhibit 3 Part 2 of Padberg Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
January 16, 2025 Filing 16 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Exhibit 3 Part 1 of Padberg Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
January 16, 2025 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by Mercis B.V. in support of motion for temporary restraining order, #14 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Padberg Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Declaration Hierl Declaration, #5 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 4)(Hierl, Michael)
January 16, 2025 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. for temporary restraining order Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and Service of Process by Email and/or Electronic Publication (Hierl, Michael)
January 16, 2025 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. for leave to file excess pages Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limitation (Hierl, Michael)
January 15, 2025 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Executive Committee: Case reassigned to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly for all further proceedings pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC 294(b). Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Request for reassignment) (ags) .
January 15, 2025 Filing 11 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (vkm, )
January 15, 2025 Filing 10 MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (vkm, )
January 14, 2025 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Mercis B.V. (Hierl, Michael)
January 14, 2025 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael)
January 14, 2025 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael)
January 14, 2025 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mercis B.V. by John Wilson (Wilson, John)
January 14, 2025 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mercis B.V. by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert)
January 14, 2025 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mercis B.V. by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William)
January 14, 2025 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mercis B.V. by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
January 14, 2025 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
January 14, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mercis B.V.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22946927. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hierl, Michael)
January 14, 2025 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (gmm, )
January 14, 2025 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (gmm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mercis B.V. v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercis B.V.
Represented By: William Benjamin Kalbac
Represented By: Robert Payton Mcmurray
Represented By: John Wilson
Represented By: Michael A. Hierl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?