Hong Kong Leyuzhen Technology Co. Limited v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified in Schedule A Hereto
Plaintiff: Hong Kong Leyuzhen Technology Co. Limited
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified in Schedule A Hereto
Case Number: 1:2025cv00497
Filed: January 15, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. § 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2025 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hong Kong Leyuzhen Technology Co. Limited ONLY as to Defendant 1 (Droter, Joseph)
February 20, 2025 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The motion for leave to withdraw counsel of record (Dckt. No. #14 ) is granted. Attorney Shawn Anthony Mangano is terminated as counsel of record. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
February 10, 2025 Filing 14 MOTION by Attorney Shawn A. Mangano to withdraw as attorney for Hong Kong Leyuzhen Technology Co. Limited. No party information provided (Kuhn, Katherine)
January 20, 2025 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Hong Kong Leyuzhen Technology Co. Limited to amend/correct MOTION by Plaintiff Hong Kong Leyuzhen Technology Co. Limited for temporary restraining order INCLUDING A TEMPORARY INJUNCTION, A TEMPORARY ASSET RESTRAINT, EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, AND SERVICE OF PROCESS BY E-MAIL AND/OR ELECTRONIC PUBLICATION #9 , complaint, #1 Motion for Leave to Amend Schedule A to the Complaint and Exhibit 7 to the Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Schedule A, #2 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 7 to Temporary Restraining Order)(Kuhn, Katherine)
January 20, 2025 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Hong Kong Leyuzhen Technology Co. Limited by Gokalp Bayramoglu (Bayramoglu, Gokalp)
January 20, 2025 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Hong Kong Leyuzhen Technology Co. Limited by Nihat Deniz Bayramoglu (Bayramoglu, Nihat)
January 20, 2025 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Hong Kong Leyuzhen Technology Co. Limited by Joseph Wendell Droter (Droter, Joseph)
January 17, 2025 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Hong Kong Leyuzhen Technology Co. Limited for temporary restraining order INCLUDING A TEMPORARY INJUNCTION, A TEMPORARY ASSET RESTRAINT, EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, AND SERVICE OF PROCESS BY E-MAIL AND/OR ELECTRONIC PUBLICATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of K. Kuhn in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of K. Kuhn, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of K. Kuhn, #4 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of K. Kuhn, #5 Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of K. Kuhn, #6 Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of K. Kuhn, #7 Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of K. Kuhn, #8 Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of K. Kuhn, #9 Declaration of K. Kuhn in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order regarding Purchases and Sales)(Kuhn, Katherine)
January 17, 2025 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Hong Kong Leyuzhen Technology Co. Limited for leave to file excess pages IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (Kuhn, Katherine)
January 16, 2025 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by April 7, 2025. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. All parties must participate in the preparation and filing of the Joint Initial Status Report. The Court requires a joint report, so a filing by one side or the other is not sufficient. Second, the parties must email a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
January 16, 2025 Filing 6 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (vkm, )
January 16, 2025 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (men, )
January 16, 2025 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 3). (men, )
January 15, 2025 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff HONG KONG LEYUZHEN TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD by Katherine Marilyn Kuhn (Kuhn, Katherine)
January 15, 2025 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff HONG KONG LEYUZHEN TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD by Shawn Anthony Mangano (Mangano, Shawn)
January 15, 2025 Filing 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by HONG KONG LEYUZHEN TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD (Mangano, Shawn)
January 15, 2025 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mangano, Shawn)
January 15, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement filed by HONG KONG LEYUZHEN TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22959014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 to the Complaint)(Mangano, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hong Kong Leyuzhen Technology Co. Limited v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified in Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hong Kong Leyuzhen Technology Co. Limited
Represented By: Katherine Marilyn Kuhn
Represented By: Nihat Deniz Bayramoglu
Represented By: Joseph Wendell Droter
Represented By: Gokalp Bayramoglu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified in Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?