TV Tokyo Corporation v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Plaintiff: TV Tokyo Corporation
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto, XPlayer Shop, TTAesthetic, spreepicky, QThandmade, printitize, Orange Fox Custom, NOXFAN, myanimekeycaps, Monkey Ninja, littleowh, Jarcase, hirosarts, gymgasm, flazzstoreindonesia, EzCustomcar, doteygirl, DECALZ, cosercosplay, Casespice, CASEFAMOUSE, ASCL Center, Anime Desk Mat, Amazing Hoodies, yufengde, xingzhanwujindian, Sky Mirrors Ctd, sanzhiyin, Putian Chengxiang District Zhanyouhua Trade Co., L, MagicVina-US, LMUMU, GUAN-RUN HAO, YOIYEN, Xavi's World, Petmallco, NeatoShop, Manlescosplay, HoodieShow Store, HachiCorp, FM-ANIME, elevenGK, chonkymy, BOMBUSBEE, apparel.quymart, nanchangwuqiangshangmaoyouxiangongsi and maomingshixiongfeishangmaoyouxiangongsi
Case Number: 1:2025cv01701
Filed: February 19, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2025 Filing 42 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: The Court grants Defendant monkeyninja.net's unopposed motion for extension to respond to the complaint #40 until 5/7/25. Motion hearing date of 4/23/25 is stricken. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
April 16, 2025 Filing 41 NOTICE of Motion by Christopher Paul Keleher for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #40 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 4/23/2025 at 09:30 AM. (Keleher, Christopher)
April 16, 2025 Filing 40 MOTION by Defendant Monkey Ninja for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (UNOPPOSED) (Keleher, Christopher)
April 16, 2025 Filing 39 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Monkey Ninja by Christopher Paul Keleher (Keleher, Christopher)
April 16, 2025 Filing 38 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TV Tokyo Corporation Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 4 (Hierl, Michael)
April 7, 2025 Filing 37 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: The Court grants Plaintiff's motion to substitute defendant and leave to file amended complaint #35 . Plaintiff may amend its complaint to substitute the identify of Defendant No. 13. The Court strikes the presentment hearing previously noticed for 4/8/25. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
April 4, 2025 Filing 36 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for leave to file #35 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 4/8/2025 at 09:30 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
April 4, 2025 Filing 35 MOTION by Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation for leave to file Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Defendant and Leave to File an Amended Complaint (Hierl, Michael)
April 4, 2025 NEW PARTIES: XPlayer Shop, TTAesthetic, spreepicky, QThandmade, printitize, Orange Fox Custom, NOXFAN, myanimekeycaps, Monkey Ninja, littleowh, Jarcase, hirosarts, gymgasm, flazzstoreindonesia, EzCustomcar, doteygirl, DECALZ, cosercosplay, Casespice, CASEFAMOUSE, ASCL Center, Anime Desk Mat, Amazing Hoodies, yufengde, xingzhanwujindian, Sky Mirrors Ctd, sanzhiyin, Putian Chengxiang District Zhanyouhua Trade Co., L, MagicVina-US, LMUMU, GUAN-RUN HAO, YOIYEN, Xavi's World, Petmallco, NeatoShop, Manlescosplay, HoodieShow Store, HachiCorp, FM-ANIME, elevenGK, chonkymy, BOMBUSBEE, apparel.quymart, nanchangwuqiangshangmaoyouxiangongsi and maomingshixiongfeishangmaoyouxiangongsi added to case caption. (Hierl, Michael)
April 1, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PRELIMINARY Injunction Order. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 4/1/2025. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
April 1, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic status hearing held and continued to 5/15/25 at 9:30 a.m. Telephonic motion hearing held. Plaintiff's Motion for entry of a preliminary injunction against Defendant Nos. 1/5, 8/24, 26/34, 36-48 and 50 #27 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. Plaintiff is ordered to add all Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 650-479-3207 and the access code is 1804010308. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
March 28, 2025 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TV Tokyo Corporation as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto on 3/27/2025, answer due 4/17/2025. (Hierl, Michael)
March 27, 2025 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TV Tokyo Corporation Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Certain Defendants (Hierl, Michael)
March 27, 2025 Filing 30 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #27 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 4/1/2025 at 09:30 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
March 27, 2025 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Michael A. Hierl regarding motion for preliminary injunction #27 (Hierl, Michael)
March 27, 2025 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM by TV Tokyo Corporation in support of motion for preliminary injunction #27 (Hierl, Michael)
March 27, 2025 Filing 27 MOTION by Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation for preliminary injunction Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Nos. 1-5, 8-24, 26-34, 36-48, and 50 (Hierl, Michael)
March 18, 2025 Filing 26 SUMMONS Issued (Court Participant) as to Defendant The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto (rjm, )
March 18, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's Ex-Parte Motion to extend the temporary restraining order #23 is granted. The temporary restraining order is extended for 14 days to 4/1/25. Telephonic status hearing set for 3/18/25 is stricken and reset to 4/1/25 at 9:30 a.m. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 650-479-3207 and the access code is 1804010308. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
March 17, 2025 Filing 23 MOTION by Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation for extension of time Plaintiff's Ex-Parte Motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order (Hierl, Michael)
March 6, 2025 Filing 22 SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 50,000.00 posted by TV Tokyo Corporation. (Document not imaged) (td, )
March 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SEALED TEMPORARY Restraining Order. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/4/2025. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
March 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic motion hearing held. Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file under seal #7 is granted. Plaintiff's Motion to exceed page limitation #14 is granted. Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary asset restraint, expedited discovery, and service of process by email and/or electronic publication #15 is granted. Enter Temporary Restraining Order. Telephonic status hearing set for 3/18/25 at 9:30 a.m. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 650-479-3207 and the access code is 1804010308. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
February 25, 2025 Filing 19 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation Exhibit 3 Part 3 of Saiki Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
February 25, 2025 Filing 18 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation Exhibit 3 Part 2 of Saiki Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
February 25, 2025 Filing 17 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation Exhibit 3 Part 1 of Saiki Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
February 25, 2025 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by TV Tokyo Corporation in support of motion for temporary restraining order, #15 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Saiki Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Declaration Hierl Declaration, #5 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 4)(Hierl, Michael)
February 25, 2025 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation for temporary restraining order Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and Service of Process by Email and/or Electronic Publication (Hierl, Michael)
February 25, 2025 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation for leave to file excess pages Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limitation (Hierl, Michael)
February 24, 2025 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic motion hearing set for 3/4/25 at 9:30 a.m. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 650-479-3207 and the access code is 1804010308. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) Modified on 2/24/2025 (lf, ).
February 20, 2025 Filing 12 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (nsf, )
February 20, 2025 Filing 11 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (nsf, )
February 19, 2025 Filing 10 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by TV Tokyo Corporation (Hierl, Michael)
February 19, 2025 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by TV Tokyo Corporation (Hierl, Michael)
February 19, 2025 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael)
February 19, 2025 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael)
February 19, 2025 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by John Wilson (Wilson, John)
February 19, 2025 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert)
February 19, 2025 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William)
February 19, 2025 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
February 19, 2025 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
February 19, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by TV Tokyo Corporation; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-23100959. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hierl, Michael)
February 19, 2025 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Laura K. McNally. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (cvk, )
February 19, 2025 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (cvk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TV Tokyo Corporation v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TV Tokyo Corporation
Represented By: Michael A. Hierl
Represented By: William Benjamin Kalbac
Represented By: Robert Payton Mcmurray
Represented By: John Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPlayer Shop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TTAesthetic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: spreepicky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QThandmade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: printitize
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange Fox Custom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOXFAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: myanimekeycaps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monkey Ninja
Represented By: Christopher Paul Keleher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: littleowh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarcase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hirosarts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: gymgasm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: flazzstoreindonesia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EzCustomcar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: doteygirl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DECALZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cosercosplay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casespice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASEFAMOUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASCL Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anime Desk Mat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazing Hoodies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yufengde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xingzhanwujindian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky Mirrors Ctd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sanzhiyin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Putian Chengxiang District Zhanyouhua Trade Co., L
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MagicVina-US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LMUMU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUAN-RUN HAO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YOIYEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavi's World
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petmallco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NeatoShop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manlescosplay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HoodieShow Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HachiCorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FM-ANIME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: elevenGK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: chonkymy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOMBUSBEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: apparel.quymart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: nanchangwuqiangshangmaoyouxiangongsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: maomingshixiongfeishangmaoyouxiangongsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?