Anagram International, LLC v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liabiltiy Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Plaintiff: Anagram International, LLC
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liabiltiy Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Case Number: 1:2025cv01737
Filed: February 19, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2025 Filing 15 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (lm, ) (lm, ).
March 7, 2025 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Upon receipt of the plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) #13 , this matter is concluded. All future dates and deadlines are stricken; all pending motions are denied as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (air, )
March 6, 2025 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Anagram International, LLC (Werber, Matthew)
February 28, 2025 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The plaintiff's motion to extend #11 is granted. The deadline to file the documents specified in the Court's 2/20/25 order #9 is continued to 2/6/25. Mailed notice (air, )
February 27, 2025 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC for extension of time -- for compliance with Dkt. 9 -- (Werber, Matthew)
February 20, 2025 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #4 is granted. Schedule A to the complaint #3 , provisionally under seal pending order, is permitted to remain under seal for the time being. Mailed notice (air, )
February 20, 2025 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: By 2/27/25, the plaintiff is required to file (1) a listing of all prior online trademark, copyright, or patent infringement cases (also known as "Schedule A" cases) filed in any court in the United States in which it was a plaintiff, and (2) a listing of any of the defendants included in the Schedule A in this case that the plaintiff has previously named as a defendant in any prior complaint or Schedule A case. Mailed notice (air, )
February 20, 2025 Filing 8 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (lm, )
February 20, 2025 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (cvk, )
February 20, 2025 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 3). (cvk, )
February 19, 2025 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC by Peter Krusiewicz (Krusiewicz, Peter)
February 19, 2025 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC by Matthew A. Werber (Werber, Matthew)
February 19, 2025 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Anagram International, LLC (Werber, Matthew)
February 19, 2025 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC to seal document exhibit #3 (Werber, Matthew)
February 19, 2025 Filing 3 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Anagram International, LLC - Schedule A to Complaint - regarding complaint, #1 (Werber, Matthew)
February 19, 2025 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Werber, Matthew)
February 19, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Anagram International, LLC; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-23105480. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copyright Registrations, #2 Exhibit 2 - CPB, #3 Exhibit 3 - IP Rights, #4 Exhibit 4 - DHS)(Werber, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anagram International, LLC v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liabiltiy Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anagram International, LLC
Represented By: Matthew A. Werber
Represented By: Peter Krusiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liabiltiy Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?