Zorro Productions, Inc. v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Plaintiff: Zorro Productions, Inc.
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Case Number: 1:2025cv01764
Filed: February 20, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Georgia N Alexakis
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2025 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Georgia N Alexakis: Plaintiff's counsel contacted the Courtroom Deputy by email requesting to reset the status hearing to allow time to effectuate service. The status hearing set for 4/24/25 is reset for 5/27/25 at 9:30 a.m. The joint status report is now due by 5/20/25. (ca, )
April 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Georgia N Alexakis on 4/11/25.(ca, )
April 11, 2025 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Georgia N Alexakis: Plaintiff's motions for expedited discovery and electronic service of process are granted #17 , #18 . No appearance is required on 4/17/25. The Court finds that expedited discovery is warranted to identify defendants. The Court also finds that electronic service does not violate any treaty and is consistent with due process because it is an effective way to communicate with the online marketplace defendants. The Court decides these issues, however, without the benefit of adversarial presentation. If any defendant were to appear and object, the Court will take a fresh look at the issues of electronic service and expedited discovery as well as any issues related to personal jurisdiction. Enter Order, as modified by the Court. (ca, )
April 10, 2025 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #17 , motion to expedite #18 before Honorable Georgia N Alexakis on 4/17/2025 at 09:30 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
April 10, 2025 Filing 18 MOTION by Plaintiff Zorro Productions, Inc. to expedite Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery (Hierl, Michael)
April 10, 2025 Filing 17 MOTION by Plaintiff Zorro Productions, Inc. Plaintiff's Motion for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Hierl, Michael)
March 10, 2025 Filing 16 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Zorro Productions, Inc. Amended Schedule A (Hierl, Michael)
March 10, 2025 Filing 15 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Zorro Productions, Inc. regarding amended complaint #14 (Hierl, Michael)
March 10, 2025 Filing 14 AMENDED complaint by Zorro Productions, Inc. against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto (Hierl, Michael)
February 27, 2025 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Georgia N Alexakis: Initial status hearing is set for 4/24/25 at 9:30 a.m. in person in Courtroom 1719. By 4/17/25,the parties shall file a Joint Initial Status Report that complies with the Court's standing order, which can be found on the Court's website. If the defendant(s) have not been served by the initial status hearing date, counsel for Plaintiff must contact the Courtroom Deputy to reschedule the status hearing and the date for filing the Joint Initial Status Report. (ca, )
February 24, 2025 Filing 12 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (jh, )
February 21, 2025 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Georgia N Alexakis: The Court grants plaintiff's ex parte motion for leave to file under seal #7 . Upon review of the complaint, the Court sua sponte raises the propriety of joining multiple trademarks and 50 defendants in a single action. By 3/10/25, plaintiff must file a supplemental memorandum addressing the propriety of joinder in light of the principles described in Estee Lauder Cosmetics Ltd. v. Schedule A, 334 F.R.D. 182 (N.D. Ill. 2020). Plaintiff's memorandum should also address this Court's order in Bug Art Limited v. The Partnerships & Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A, 24 CV 7777, Dkt. 28 (N.D. Ill. Oct. 8, 2024), and Yi Pu (Tianjin) Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd. v. Gyroor et al, 25 CV 81, Dkt. 19 (N.D. Ill. Jan. 28, 2025), as well as other orders in this District expressing similar concerns regarding misjoinder in Schedule A cases, namely, Zaful (Hong Kong) Limited v. The Partnerships & Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A, 24 CV 11111, Dkt. 12 (N.D. Ill. Jan. 10, 2025); Toyota Motor Sales, USA, Inc. v. The Partnerships & Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A, 24 CV 9401, Dkt. 27 (N.D. Ill. Nov. 18, 2024); Viking Arm AS v. The Partnerships & Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A, 24 C 1566, 2024 WL 2953105, at *3 (N.D. Ill. June 6, 2024); and Bailie v. The Partnerships & Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A, 24 CV 02150, 2024 WL 2209698 (N.D. Ill. May 15, 2024). In the alternative, plaintiff has leave to file an amended complaint and Amended Schedule A by 3/10/25 with a smaller subset of defendants along with a memorandum explaining why each defendant is properly joined to the others. (ca, )
February 20, 2025 Filing 10 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Zorro Productions, Inc. (Hierl, Michael)
February 20, 2025 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Zorro Productions, Inc. (Hierl, Michael)
February 20, 2025 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Zorro Productions, Inc. Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael)
February 20, 2025 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Zorro Productions, Inc. to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael)
February 20, 2025 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Zorro Productions, Inc. by John Wilson (Wilson, John)
February 20, 2025 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Zorro Productions, Inc. by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert)
February 20, 2025 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Zorro Productions, Inc. by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William)
February 20, 2025 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Zorro Productions, Inc. by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
February 20, 2025 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
February 20, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Zorro Productions, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-23108815. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael)
February 20, 2025 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mam, )
February 20, 2025 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Georgia N Alexakis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (mam, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zorro Productions, Inc. v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zorro Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Hierl
Represented By: William Benjamin Kalbac
Represented By: Robert Payton Mcmurray
Represented By: John Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?