TV Tokyo Corporation v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Plaintiff: TV Tokyo Corporation
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Case Number: 1:2025cv01879
Filed: February 24, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan B Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2025 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Plaintiff's motion #20 for leave to serve the summons and complaint by electronic delivery is denied without prejudice as premature for the reasons explained in paragraph seven of this court's standing order #18 in "Schedule A" cases. In its supporting memorandum of law #21 , plaintiff neither cites nor attempts to distinguish Luxottica Group S.p.A. v. Defendants Identified on Schedule A, 391 F. Supp. 3d 816, 82021 (N.D. Ill. 2019). Although plaintiff searched an online map service for the mailing address listed on defendant's Walmart.com web page, ECF No. [21-2], plaintiff has not sought discovery to determine whether Walmart has a valid mailing address for defendant. Nor does plaintiff explain why third-party discovery would be futile. Accordingly, plaintiff has failed to demonstrate reasonably diligent efforts to locate defendant, as required by Article I of the Hague Service Convention. See Luxottica, 391 F. Supp. 3d at 82021. Mailed notice (mjc, )
February 28, 2025 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in support of #20 Motion for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt, #3 Exhibit 1-2, of Keith A. Vogt's declaration)(Vogt, Keith)
February 28, 2025 Filing 20 MOTION by TV Tokyo Corporation for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Vogt, Keith)
February 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: An initial status report is due on or before April 30, 2025. Counsel and parties are directed to familiarize themselves with the pretrial procedures in Judge Gottschall's case management packet, which is available from the court's website at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Please pay particular attention to the requirement to exchange initial disclosures within fourteen days of the parties' initial discovery planning conference and the court's requirement that the parties are to explore settlement opportunities and identify areas of agreement prior to the filing of the first status report.If, by the due date of the scheduled status report, defendants have not been served, plaintiff should email chambers_gottschall@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reset the status date. Counsel in cases removed from another court should follow these procedures to the extent applicable. See the order and Judge Gottschall's case management packet for further details. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 2/27/2025.Mailed notice(mjc, )
February 27, 2025 Filing 18 STANDING ORDER IN "SCHEDULE A" CASES Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 2/27/2025. Mailed notice(mjc, )
February 27, 2025 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Plaintiff filed Schedule A to its complaint #2 under seal without an accompanying Local Rule 26.2(c) motion to seal. Plaintiff has until and including 03/05/2025 to file a motion to seal. If no timely motion to seal is filed, Schedule A #2 will be unsealed on 03/06/2025. Mailed notice (mjc, )
February 24, 2025 Filing 16 Amended Schedule A to Complaint #1 and Schedule A #2 by TV Tokyo Corporation (Vogt, Keith)
February 24, 2025 Filing 15 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by TV Tokyo Corporation (Vogt, Keith)
February 24, 2025 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi)
February 24, 2025 Filing 13 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (smb, )
February 24, 2025 Filing 12 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (smb, )
February 24, 2025 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi)
February 24, 2025 Filing 10 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (smb, )
February 24, 2025 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling)
February 24, 2025 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Monica Rita Martin (Martin, Monica)
February 24, 2025 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Christopher Romero (Romero, Christopher)
February 24, 2025 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Cameron Eugene Mcintyre (Mcintyre, Cameron)
February 24, 2025 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam)
February 24, 2025 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith)
February 24, 2025 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith)
February 24, 2025 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation Schedule A to Complaint #1 (Vogt, Keith)
February 24, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by TV Tokyo Corporation; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-23121592. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Vogt, Keith)
February 24, 2025 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Keri L. Holleb Hotaling. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 3). (cvk, )
February 24, 2025 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (cvk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TV Tokyo Corporation v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TV Tokyo Corporation
Represented By: Keith A. Vogt
Represented By: Yi Bu
Represented By: Yanling Jiang
Represented By: Monica Rita Martin
Represented By: Christopher Romero
Represented By: Cameron Eugene Mcintyre
Represented By: Adam Grodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?