TV Tokyo Corporation v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Plaintiff: TV Tokyo Corporation
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Case Number: 1:2025cv01943
Filed: February 25, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2025 Filing 27 FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/25/2025. Emailed notice (cn).
March 25, 2025 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Telephonic hearing held on 3/25/2025. Based on counsel's representation that, after conducting an investigation with reasonable diligence, the addresses of the defendants to be served are not known, the court finds that the Hague Convention on the Service Abroad of Judicial and Extrajudicial Documents in Civil or Commercial Matters does not apply. Therefore, the court grants the motion for default judgment under Rule 55. Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Against the Defendants Identified in First Amended Schedule A #23 is granted. Enter order. Civil case terminated. Emailed notice (cn).
March 24, 2025 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Telephonic hearing set for 3/25/2025 at 9:15 a.m. on the Webex platform. Parties will not be asked to start their video. Counsel of record and other essential case participants will receive an email prior to the start of the hearing with instructions to join the hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Emailed notice (cn).
March 24, 2025 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM by TV Tokyo Corporation in support of motion for default judgment #23 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt, #4 Declaration of Hiroaki Saiki)(Vogt, Keith)
March 24, 2025 Filing 23 MOTION by Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation for default judgment as to the Defendants Identified in First Amended Schedule A (Vogt, Keith)
March 23, 2025 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs as to [Certain] defendants (Vogt, Keith)
February 28, 2025 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TV Tokyo Corporation as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A on 2/28/2025, answer due 3/21/2025. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Vogt, Keith)
February 26, 2025 Filing 20 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A (khg, )
February 26, 2025 Filing 19 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (ph, )
February 26, 2025 Filing 18 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 (List of Trademarks, Ex. 1), #2 (List of Trademarks, Ex. 2))(ph, )
February 26, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT EXPEDITED DISCOVERY AND SERVICE OF PROCESS BY E-MAIL AND/OR ELECTRONIC PUBLICATION signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/26/2025. Emailed notice (cn).
February 26, 2025 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion For Leave To Conduct Expedited Discovery And Electronic Service Of Process Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) 13 is granted. Enter order. Emailed notice (cn).
February 25, 2025 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of 13 Exparte Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-1, #2 Exhibit 1-2, #3 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt, #4 Exhibit 1-2, of Keith A. Vogt's Declaration)(Vogt, Keith)
February 25, 2025 Filing 12 Schedule A to Complaint #1 and Schedule A to Complaint #2 by TV Tokyo Corporation (Vogt, Keith)
February 25, 2025 Filing 11 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by TV Tokyo Corporation (Vogt, Keith)
February 25, 2025 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi)
February 25, 2025 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling)
February 25, 2025 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Monica Rita Martin (Martin, Monica)
February 25, 2025 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Christopher Romero (Romero, Christopher)
February 25, 2025 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Cameron Eugene Mcintyre (Mcintyre, Cameron)
February 25, 2025 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam)
February 25, 2025 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith)
February 25, 2025 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith)
February 25, 2025 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff TV Tokyo Corporation Schedule A to Complaint #1 (Vogt, Keith)
February 25, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by TV Tokyo Corporation; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-23128121. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Vogt, Keith)
February 25, 2025 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (cvk, )
February 25, 2025 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (cvk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TV Tokyo Corporation v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TV Tokyo Corporation
Represented By: Yi Bu
Represented By: Yanling Jiang
Represented By: Monica Rita Martin
Represented By: Christopher Romero
Represented By: Cameron Eugene Mcintyre
Represented By: Adam Grodman
Represented By: Keith A. Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?