Pomega Energy Storage Technologies, Inc. et al v. Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.
Plaintiff: POMEGA ENERGY STORAGE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. and Kontrolmatik Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Jones Lang Lasalle Americas, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2025cv02892
Filed: March 19, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sunil R Harjani
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2025 Filing 33 RECEIVED from South Carolina; Case Number 2:24-cv-03205. (ph, )
March 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Transfer Case. The Court hereby grants Defendant's motion to transfer venue and transfers this matter to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. (ECF No. 4.) The Court declines to rule on the merits of Defendant's motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim, (ECF No. 23), and leaves resolution of that motion for the transferee court.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 3/19/2025.(rhei, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
September 4, 2024 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.. (Wrenn, Catherine) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
August 29, 2024 Filing 28 TEXT ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's reply to #24 Plaintiffs' Response is due by 09/04/2024. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 08/29/2024.(rhei, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
August 27, 2024 Filing 27 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 9/10/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Wrenn, Catherine) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
August 21, 2024 Filing 26 TEXT ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #24 Plaintiffs' response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Defendant's Reply is due by 8/28/2024. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 08/21/2024.(rhei, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
August 19, 2024 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 9/3/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Wrenn, Catherine) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
August 14, 2024 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Kontrolmatik Technologies, Inc., Pomega Energy Storage Technologies, Inc..Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/21/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Hanna, Frederick) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
July 31, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 8/14/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memo of Understanding)No proposed order.(Wrenn, Catherine) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
July 25, 2024 Filing 22 TEXT ORDER: #10 Mediation Order and #9 Scheduling Order are stayed pending the Court's ruling on Defendant's Motion to Transfer. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 07/25/2024. (rhei, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
July 25, 2024 Filing 21 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim based on the filing of #16 AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 07/25/2024.(rhei, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
July 17, 2024 Filing 20 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Kontrolmatik Technologies, Inc., Pomega Energy Storage Technologies, Inc..(Robinson, Jonathan) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
July 17, 2024 Filing 19 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc..(Wrenn, Catherine) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
July 17, 2024 Filing 18 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc..(Wrenn, Catherine) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
July 17, 2024 Filing 17 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wrenn, Catherine) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
July 17, 2024 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc., filed by Pomega Energy Storage Technologies, Inc., Kontrolmatik Technologies, Inc.. Service due by 10/15/2024 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Article Exhibit A) (Robinson, Jonathan) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
July 10, 2024 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' response to #13 MOTION TO DISMISS due by 07/25/2024. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 07/10/2024.(rhei, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
July 9, 2024 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Kontrolmatik Technologies, Inc., Pomega Energy Storage Technologies, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 7/23/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Robinson, Jonathan) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
June 27, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 7/11/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memo of Understanding)No proposed order.(Wrenn, Catherine) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
June 20, 2024 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case Response filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Supplemental Affidavit of Keith Stauber)(Wrenn, Catherine) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
June 12, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case Response filed by Kontrolmatik Technologies, Inc., Pomega Energy Storage Technologies, Inc..Reply to Response to Motion due by 6/20/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit US District Courts Table T-3, #3 Exhibit US District Courts Table C)(Hanna, Frederick) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
June 12, 2024 Filing 10 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 12/6/2024, Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 06/12/2024. (rhei, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
June 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/3/2024, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/17/2024, Rule 26 Report due by 7/17/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/7/2024, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/6/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/7/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/7/2024, Discovery due by 12/6/2024, Motions due by 1/6/2025, Jury Selection Deadline 4/7/2025, Mediation Due by 12/6/2024, Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 06/12/2024. (rhei, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
June 10, 2024 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Kontrolmatik Technologies, Inc., Pomega Energy Storage Technologies, Inc..(Robinson, Jonathan) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
June 6, 2024 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. answer due 6/27/2024. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 06/06/2024.(hcor, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
May 30, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Colleton County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Notice of Removal Signed by Clerk)(Wrenn, Catherine) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
May 29, 2024 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 6/12/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Wrenn, Catherine) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
May 29, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to Transfer Case by Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 6/12/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memo of Understanding Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Keith Stauber)No proposed order.(Wrenn, Catherine) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
May 28, 2024 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc..(hcor, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]
May 28, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Colleton County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2024CP1500302. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11788332), filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Secretary of State Filings)(hcor, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 3/19/2025.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pomega Energy Storage Technologies, Inc. et al v. Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POMEGA ENERGY STORAGE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan M. Robinson
Represented By: Frederick Newman Hanna, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kontrolmatik Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan M. Robinson
Represented By: Frederick Newman Hanna, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones Lang Lasalle Americas, Inc.
Represented By: John Adam Woods
Represented By: Catherine Farrell Wrenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?