Bergstrom, Inc. v. Glacier Bay, Inc.

Plaintiff: Bergstrom, Inc.
Defendant: Glacier Bay, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv50078
Filed: May 5, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Patent Office
County: Winnebago
Presiding Judge: Frederick J. Kapala
Referring Judge: P. Michael Mahoney
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1338 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2012 281 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 3/9/2012: The parties' objections 249 250 are overruled in part and sustained in part. The Special Master's Report and Recommendation 230 is accepted as modified. Glacier Bay's motion for an order of reference of any summary judgment motions relating to infringement and/or validity to the Special Master 254 is denied. [For further details see order.]Electronic notice(jat, )
August 31, 2010 189 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 8/31/2010:(pg, )
January 22, 2010 110 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 1/22/2010:(jat, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bergstrom, Inc. v. Glacier Bay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bergstrom, Inc.
Represented By: David G. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glacier Bay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?