Belbachir v. United States

Plaintiff: Abdelkader Rachid Belbachir
Defendant: United States
Case Number: 3:2008cv50193
Filed: September 3, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: McHenry
Referring Judge: P. Michael Mahoney
Presiding Judge: Philip G. Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2012 232 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 11/9/2012: For the reasons set forth below, defendant's motion for summary judgment 205 is granted. Plaintiff's motion to strike and to file surreply 206 is denied as moot. This case is terminated. [For further details see order.] Electronic notice(jat, )
January 31, 2012 192 Opinion or Order of the Court Motion to dismiss 128 is denied; WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 1/31/2012: Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 1/31/2012:Electronic notice(pg, )
January 4, 2012 174 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 1/4/2012: Plaintiff's motion to unseal documents 139 is granted, in part. The court adopts the recommendations contained in the report prepared by the United States. The parties are ordered to re-file appropriate documents electronically in the court file in conformity with this order. Appropriately redacted versions of all previously sealed motions, responses, and associated memoranda or exhibits are to be re-filed by Janua ry 18, 2012. Parties are instructed to file items as an amended document on the CM/ECF system and link them back to the appropriate docket entry. Replies remain due February 3, 2012 and should be filed in conformity with this order and the government 's report. The parties should not send courtesy copies to the court. The briefing schedule and timeline for the motions will not be affected by this order. All future filings should comply with the government's report until further order of the court. Parties have 14 days from service, as calculated under Rule 6, to file objections with Judge Reinhard pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 72. Any objection not made within the 14 day time frame may be waived for the purposes of appeal. Objections need not be presented as stated in L.R.5.3.[For further details see order.]Notices mailed by Judicial staff. (jat, )
August 9, 2011 124 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 8/9/2011: For the reasons stated below, the magistrate judge's ruling on plaintiff's motion to compel will not be set aside. Plaintiff's objection is denied. [For further details see order.] Electronic Notices.(jat, )
November 15, 2010 89 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 11/15/2010: Pursuant to the District Court's Order 87 and the agreement of the parties, the magistrate judge has reexamined Plaintiff's motion to compel 53 Defendant to produce deponent Dan Young under Rule 26(b). Plaintiff's motion 53 is granted in part. [For further details see order.] Notices mailed by Judicial staff.(jat, )
August 13, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 8/13/2010:(pg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belbachir v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdelkader Rachid Belbachir
Represented By: Janis M. Susler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?