Cars R Us Sales And Rentals, Inc. et al v. Ford Motor Company

Plaintiff: Michael Beggin and Cars R Us Sales And Rentals, Inc.
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 3:2008cv50270
Filed: December 12, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability Office
County: Stephenson
Referring Judge: P. Michael Mahoney
Presiding Judge: Philip G. Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 3/31/2011: For the reasons stated below, plaintiffs' motion to alter or amend (Rule 59(e)) or grant relief from judgment (Rule 60(b)) 78 is denied. [For further details see order.] Electronic Notices.(jat, )
January 19, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 1/19/2011: For the reasons stated below, defendant's motion for summary judgment 48 is granted. Judgment is entered in favor of defendant and against plaintiffs. This case is terminated. [For further details see order.] Electronic Notices.(jat, )
July 26, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 7/26/2010:(pg, )
June 18, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 6/18/2009:(jat, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cars R Us Sales And Rentals, Inc. et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Beggin
Represented By: H. Evan Williams, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cars R Us Sales And Rentals, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Kevin Barger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?