Casciaro v. Combs et al.
Plaintiff: Mario Casciaro
Defendant: Unknown McHenry County Assistant State's Attorneys, Keith Von Allmen, Unknown City of Johnsburg Police Officers, The City of Johnsburg, McHenry County and Michael Combs
Case Number: 3:2017cv50094
Filed: March 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Rockford Office
County: McHenry
Presiding Judge: Iain D. Johnston
Presiding Judge: Philip G. Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendations: This matter comes before the court on the Order, Report and Recommendations ("R & R") 163 of Magistrate Judge Johnston recommending that defendants' motion to dismiss state law claims ag ainst defendant Rydberg and all claims against the unknown officers be granted. The court may accept, reject or modify, in whole or in part, the findings or recommendations of the magistrate judge in a report and recommendation. See FED. R. CIV. P . 72(b)(3). The court must review de novo the portions of the report to which objections are made. Id. "If no objection or only partial objection is made, the district court judge reviews those unobjected portions for clear error." Johns on v. Zema Sys. Corp., 170 F.3d 734, 739 (7th Cir. 1999). In this case, the court has received no objections to the R & R (see 163 , showing that objections were due by March 13, 2020). The court has reviewed the record in this case and finds tha t the February 28, 2020, R & R is not clearly erroneous. Accordingly, the court adopts in its entirety Judge Johnston's R & R. State law claims against defendant Rydberg and all claims against the unknown officers are dismissed. Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 3/16/2020:electronic notice(pg, )
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER-WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 8/23/2018:For the reasons set forth below, defendants' motions to dismiss plaintiff's second amended complaint 73 ; 82 are granted in part and denied in part. The part ies are directed to contact Magistrate Judge Johnston within 30 days to discuss whether a settlement conference or mediation would be beneficial at this time. [see STATEMENT-OPINION] Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 8/23/2018. Electronic notice (kms)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER : For the reasons stated below, defendants' motion 41 to dismiss is denied. The parties are directed to contact Magistrate Judge Johnston within 30 days to discuss whether a settlement conference or mediation would be beneficial at this time. [See STATEMENT-OPINION] Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 11/22/2017. Electronic notice (jp, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casciaro v. Combs et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Casciaro
Represented By: Kathleen T. Zellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown McHenry County Assistant State's Attorneys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Von Allmen
Represented By: Cynthia Sara Grandfield
Represented By: K. Austin Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown City of Johnsburg Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Johnsburg
Represented By: Cynthia Sara Grandfield
Represented By: K. Austin Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McHenry County
Represented By: Terry A. Ekl
Represented By: Patrick L. Provenzale
Represented By: Tracy L Stanker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Combs
Represented By: Terry A. Ekl
Represented By: Patrick L. Provenzale
Represented By: Tracy L Stanker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?