Bartlett, Jr. v. Patera et al

Plaintiff: Roy M. Bartlett, Jr.
Defendant: Citizens State Bank and Marci L. Patera
Case Number: 3:2018cv50279
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Rockford Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
0 Judge: Iain D Johnston
1 Judge: Philip G Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Defendant Paterea's motion for an extension of time #8 is granted. The defendant shall respond to the motion to remand #6 by 11/2/2018, and the plaintiff shall reply by 11/19/2018. Initial status hearing remains set for 2/15/2019 at 9:30 AM. (yxp, )
October 17, 2018 8 MOTION by Defendant Marci L. Patera for extension of time to file reply to Bartlett's Motion To Remand (pg, )
September 18, 2018 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: On the plaintiff's motion to remand #6 , the defendants shall respond by 10/18/2018 and the plaintiff shall reply by 11/2/2018. Presentment of the motion set for 9/25/2018 is stricken. Defendant Patera's motion for a continuance #5 is granted. The initial status hearing previously set for 10/19/2018 is stricken, and is reset to 2/15/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (yxp, )
September 17, 2018 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Roy M. Bartlett, Jr. to remand (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit)(Rudolph, Charles)
September 17, 2018 5 MOTION by Defendant Marci L. Patera to continue (pg, )
September 12, 2018 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Initial status hearing set for 10/19/2018 at 9:30 AM. By 10/15/2018, the parties shall jointly complete the pdf fillable initial status report form found on the Court's webpage under Initial Status Conferences and Reports. Plaintiff's counsel and defendant must appear in person at the initial status hearing. Mailed notice (yxp, )
August 23, 2018 3 Declaration RE: Notice Of Filing Notice Of Removal. Proof Of Service To All Parties by Marci L. Patera (pg, )
August 20, 2018 MAILED notice of removal letter to counsel for plaintiff (jp, )
August 20, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (jp, )
August 20, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Marci L. Patera; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 46243003897 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31)(jp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartlett, Jr. v. Patera et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens State Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marci L. Patera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy M. Bartlett, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Bryan Rudolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?