Beltran et al v. McHenry Township Board of Trustees et al
Plaintiff: Abigail Adams, Ken Boettcher, Amanda Blake, William M. King, Robert Rosenburg, Craig Adams, Ronald Polidor, Brad Hettermann, Dorothea King, Dinna Webber, Kurt Mahlako, John Maricito, MaryLou Wiegold, Brian Durkin, Mary Mahady, Nancy Felix, Thomas Szramek, Lorraine Halinski, Mariclaire Adams, Diane Adams, Georgiann G. Faso, Tom Curry, Colleen Szramek, John Webber, Lawrence Mullally, Marsha Nelson, Michael A. Tauler, Brendan Slovacek, Lisa Mullally, Judith Gottlieb and Robert Beltran
Defendant: McHenry Township Board of Trustees, Bob Anderson, James Condon, McHenry Township Road District, Illinois Board of Elections, Mary McClellan, Dan Alyward, Steve Verr, Mike Rakestraw and Stan Wojewski
Case Number: 3:2018cv50317
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Iain D Johnston
Referring Judge: Frederick J Kapala
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala: Pursuant to plaintiffs' notice of voluntary dismissal, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Any pending motions are now moot and all court dates are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (sb, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Hibbs, Genna)
October 10, 2018 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Illinois Board of Elections by Thomas A. Ioppolo (Ioppolo, Thomas)
October 10, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: In light of Judge Kapala's ruling #11 , by 10/23/2018 the parties shall file a joint position paper identifying what if any part of this case may proceed consistent with Judge Kapala's application of Younger. (yxp, )
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER : Plaintiffs' motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction #7 is denied. The previously filed motion seeking the same relief #4 is denied as moot. [See STATEMENT] Signed by the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 10/5/2018. Mailed notice (jp, )
October 3, 2018 Filing 10 corrected NOTICE of Motion by Genna S Hibbs for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order,, #7 , motion for temporary restraining order,, #4 before Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 10/5/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Hibbs, Genna)
October 3, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by Craig Adams, Dan Alyward, Bob Anderson, McHenry Township Board of Trustees, Mike Rakestraw, Steve Verr re response to motion, #8 (Militello, James)
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE by Craig Adams, Dan Alyward, Bob Anderson, McHenry Township Board of Trustees, Mike Rakestraw, Steve Verr, Stan Wojewski to MOTION by Plaintiffs Abigail Adams, Craig Adams, Diane Adams, Mariclaire Adams, Robert Beltran, Amanda Blake, Ken Boettcher, Tom Curry, Brian Durkin, Georgiann G. Faso, Nancy Felix, Judith Gottlieb, Lorraine Halinski, Brad Hettermann, Dorothea King, Wi #7 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Militello, James)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiffs Abigail Adams, Craig Adams, Diane Adams, Mariclaire Adams, Robert Beltran, Amanda Blake, Ken Boettcher, Tom Curry, Brian Durkin, Georgiann G. Faso, Nancy Felix, Judith Gottlieb, Lorraine Halinski, Brad Hettermann, Dorothea King, William M. King, Mary Mahady, Kurt Mahlako, John Maricito, Lawrence Mullally, Lisa Mullally, Marsha Nelson, Ronald Polidor, Robert Rosenburg, Brendan Slovacek, Colleen Szramek, Thomas Szramek, Michael A. Tauler, Dinna Webber, John Webber, MaryLou Wiegold for temporary restraining order Judge Kapala (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Filing)(Hibbs, Genna)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Craig Adams, Dan Alyward, Bob Anderson, McHenry Township Board of Trustees, Mike Rakestraw, Steve Verr, Stan Wojewski by James Guisty Militello, III (Militello, James)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Status hearing held on 9/27/2018. Plaintiffs shall file a jurisdictional statement by 10/1/2018. The plaintiffs motion for temporary restraining order shall be set for a presentment hearing before Judge Kapala. (yxp, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiffs Abigail Adams, Craig Adams, Diane Adams, Mariclaire Adams, Robert Beltran, Amanda Blake, Ken Boettcher, Tom Curry, Brian Durkin, Georgiann G. Faso, Nancy Felix, Judith Gottlieb, Lorraine Halinski, Brad Hettermann, Dorothea King, William M. King, Mary Mahady, Kurt Mahlako, John Maricito, Lawrence Mullally, Lisa Mullally, Marsha Nelson, Ronald Polidor, Robert Rosenburg, Brendan Slovacek, Colleen Szramek, Thomas Szramek, Michael A. Tauler, Dinna Webber, John Webber, MaryLou Wiegold for temporary restraining order Emergency (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hibbs, Genna)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re complaint, #1 (Hibbs, Genna)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Abigail Adams, Craig Adams, Diane Adams, Mariclaire Adams, Robert Beltran, Amanda Blake, Ken Boettcher, Tom Curry, Brian Durkin, Georgiann G. Faso, Nancy Felix, Judith Gottlieb, Lorraine Halinski, Brad Hettermann, Dorothea King, William M. King, Mary Mahady, Kurt Mahlako, John Maricito, Lawrence Mullally, Lisa Mullally, Marsha Nelson, Ronald Polidor, Robert Rosenburg, Brendan Slovacek, Colleen Szramek, Thomas Szramek, Michael A. Tauler, Dinna Webber, John Webber, MaryLou Wiegold by Genna S Hibbs (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Hibbs, Genna)
September 25, 2018 MAILED Local Rule 83.16 to counsel for plaintiffs (jp, )
September 25, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala and Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Iain D. Johnston. (jp, )
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified filed by Robert Beltran, Craig Adams, Judith Gottlieb; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14988569. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A through K, #2 Exhibit Exhibits L through T, #3 Exhibit Exhibits U through II, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hibbs, Genna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beltran et al v. McHenry Township Board of Trustees et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abigail Adams
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Boettcher
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Blake
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William M. King
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Rosenburg
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Adams
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Polidor
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Hettermann
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothea King
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinna Webber
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Mahlako
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Maricito
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MaryLou Wiegold
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Durkin
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Mahady
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Felix
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Szramek
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Halinski
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariclaire Adams
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Adams
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgiann G. Faso
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Curry
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Szramek
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Webber
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Mullally
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Nelson
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Tauler
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendan Slovacek
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Mullally
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Gottlieb
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Beltran
Represented By: Genna S Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McHenry Township Board of Trustees
Represented By: James Guisty Militello, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Anderson
Represented By: James Guisty Militello, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Condon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McHenry Township Road District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Board of Elections
Represented By: Thomas A. Ioppolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Alyward
Represented By: James Guisty Militello, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Verr
Represented By: James Guisty Militello, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Rakestraw
Represented By: James Guisty Militello, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Wojewski
Represented By: James Guisty Militello, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?