Mason o/b/o A.M. a minor v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Lakisha Mason
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Case Number: 3:2018cv50329
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
0 Judge: Iain D Johnston
1 Judge: Frederick J Kapala
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2018 9 DESIGNATION of Monica V Mallory as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Nancy A Berryhill (Mallory, Monica)
October 16, 2018 8 COMPLAINT filed by Lakisha Mason; (pg, )
October 15, 2018 7 PAYMENT of Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15057637. (Seibold, Stephanie)
October 12, 2018 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: The plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is denied because her application reveals income sufficient to pay the filing fee. The plaintiff shall pay the filing fee by 10/26/2018 or this case may be subject to dismissal for failing to pay the filing fee. (yxp, )
October 12, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala and Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Iain D. Johnston. (jp, )
October 12, 2018 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lakisha Mason o/b/o A.M. a minor by Stephanie Renee Seibold (Seibold, Stephanie)
October 12, 2018 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lakisha Mason o/b/o A.M. a minor by Tracy Lynn Jones (Jones, Tracy)
October 12, 2018 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Jones, Tracy)
October 12, 2018 2 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Lakisha Mason o/b/o A.M. a minor for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Jones, Tracy)
October 12, 2018 1 RECEIVED COMPLAINT filed by Lakisha Mason o/b/o A.M. a minor; (Jones, Tracy) Modified on 10/12/2018 (jp, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason o/b/o A.M. a minor v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakisha Mason
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Jones
Represented By: Stephanie Renee Seibold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Monica V Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?