Detrick v. Experian Information Solutions Inc et al

Plaintiff: Jon B Detrick
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc and Craig M Boundy
Case Number: 3:2018cv50359
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
0 Judge: Iain D Johnston
1 Judge: Philip G Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2018 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Presentment of the defendants' motion to dismiss #9 set for 1/2/2019 is stricken and is reset to 1/18/2019 at 11:30 AM to coincide with the initial status hearing previously set for that date. Defense counsel is advised to consult this Court's webpage when scheduling motions. Mailed notice. (yxp, )
December 19, 2018 11 NOTICE of Motion by Christopher Adam Hall for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #9 before Honorable Iain D. Johnston on 1/2/2019 at 10:00 AM. (Hall, Christopher)
December 19, 2018 10 MEMORANDUM by Craig M Boundy in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #9 (Hall, Christopher)
December 19, 2018 9 MOTION by Defendant Craig M Boundy to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Craig M Boundy (Hall, Christopher)
December 19, 2018 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Inc(Hall, Christopher)
December 3, 2018 7 LETTER from Craig Boundy dated 12/3/18. (pg, )
November 19, 2018 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: The defendants' motion for an extension of time #4 is granted. The defendants answer is now due 12/19/2018. Initial status hearing set for 1/18/2019 at 11:30 AM. The plaintiff and defense counsel must appear in person. Parties shall refer to Judge Johnston's web page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov and file a joint status report by 1/11/2019 as set forth in the Initial Status Conferences procedure. Mailed notice (yxp, )
November 16, 2018 5 NOTICE of Motion by Christopher Adam Hall for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #4 before Honorable Iain D. Johnston on 11/27/2018 at 10:00 AM. (Hall, Christopher)
November 16, 2018 4 MOTION by Defendants Craig M Boundy, Experian Information Solutions Inc for extension of time to file answer (Hall, Christopher)
November 9, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard and Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, )
November 9, 2018 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hall, Christopher)
November 9, 2018 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Craig M Boundy, Experian Information Solutions Inc by Christopher Adam Hall (Hall, Christopher)
November 9, 2018 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Lee County, Illinois, case number (18-sc-0655) filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15165020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Assignment Order)(Hall, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Detrick v. Experian Information Solutions Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Christopher Adam Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig M Boundy
Represented By: Christopher Adam Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon B Detrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?