Richter v. LG Chem Michigan, Inc.

Plaintiff: Taylor Richter
Defendant: LG Chem Michigan, Inc. and LG Chem, Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2018cv50360
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
0 Judge: Iain D Johnston
1 Judge: Frederick J Kapala
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant LG Chem, Ltd. (yt)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED complaint by Taylor Richter against LG Chem, Ltd. and terminating LG Chem Michigan, Inc. (Handler, Joel)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Initial status hearing set for 1/17/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on the Court's webpage under Initial Status Conferences and Reports and file by 1/11/2019. Lead counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear in person at the initial status hearing. Plaintiff is directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. (yxp, )
November 13, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant LG Chem Michigan, Inc. (acm)
November 13, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala and Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Taylor Richter by Joel F. Handler (Handler, Joel)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Taylor Richter; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15168934. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Handler, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richter v. LG Chem Michigan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Richter
Represented By: Joel F. Handler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem Michigan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?