Covelli v. Varga et al
Plaintiff: Robert Frank Covelli
Defendant: Wexford Healthcare Corporation, Marrindino, John Doe's 1-5, Justin Wilkes, Newman, John Baldwin, Sonja Nicklaus, Sherry Benton, John Varga, James Martins, Non Dixon "Orange Crush) Statewide Unit, Allen, Louis Castillo, John Doe's 6 Thru 9 and Troy Hendrix
Case Number: 3:2019cv50037
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Iain D Johnston
Referring Judge: Frederick J Kapala
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 11 TRI-MOTION / Declaration by Plaintiff Robert Frank Covelli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope postmark 03/28/2019) (jk, )
March 6, 2019 Sent documents to Plaintiff and Trust Fund Officer per 3/6/19 order (pg, )
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Plaintiffs application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis ( #4 , supplemented by #9 ) is granted. The trust fund officer at Plaintiffs place of incarceration is authorized to deduct $2.63 from Plaintiffs account as the initial partial payment of the filing fee and to continue making deductions in accordance with this order. The Clerk shall send a copy of this order to the Supervisor of Inmate Trust Fund Accounts at Plaintiffs place of incarceration. Summonses, however, shall not issue as Plaintiffs complaint #1 is dismissed without prejudice. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this lawsuit, he must submit an amended complaint using the Courts form that addresses the concerns discussed in this order. If he does not comply by April 6, 2019, the Court will summarily dismiss this lawsuit. Plaintiffs motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice, his motion for service of process at government expense #5 is denied as unnecessary, and his motion for a temporary restraining order and permanent injunction #6 is denied without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff an amended complaint form and instructions. Signed by the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala on 3/6/2019:mailed notice(pg, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 PRISONER Trust Fund Account Statement. (jk, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT / Exhibit K-3 of Roberto Covelli in support of complaint preliminary injunction and and all other moving documents. (jk, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER from Robert Frank Covelli dated 4/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Mailed Exhibits and Envelope, #3 Envelope postmark 02/15/2019) (jk, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Robert Frank Covelli for preliminary injunction, MOTION by Plaintiff Robert Frank Covelli for temporary restraining order (pg, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Robert Frank Covelli For Service Of Process At Government Expense (pg, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Robert Frank Covelli for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (pg, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION by Plaintiff Robert Frank Covelli for attorney representation (pg, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (pg, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 1 copy by Robert Frank Covelli (pg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Covelli v. Varga et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Healthcare Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marrindino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe's 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonja Nicklaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Varga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Martins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Non Dixon "Orange Crush) Statewide Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe's 6 Thru 9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Frank Covelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?